EP2341135 - Rationally-designed meganucleases with altered sequence specificity and DNA-binding affinity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Precision Biosciences 104 T.W. Anderson Drive, Bldg. 7 P.O. Box 12292, Research Triangle Park Durham, NC 27709 / US | [2011/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hellinga, Homme, W. 5212 Pine Cone Lane Durham, NC 27705 / US | 02 /
Smith, James, Jefferson 1808 Carnation Drive Durham, NC 27703 / US | 03 /
Jantz, Derek 914 Ninth Street Durham, NC 27705 / US | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | Grund, Martin GRUND Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10191915.7 | 18.10.2006 | [2011/27] | Priority number, date | US20050727512P | 18.10.2005 Original published format: US 727512 P | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2341135 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2341135 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/22, C12N15/90 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
A61K38/465 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/8213 (US);
C12N15/902 (US);
C12N15/905 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/27] | Title | German: | Rational konstruierte Meganukleasen mit veränderter Sequenzspezifität und DNA-Bindungsaffinität | [2011/27] | English: | Rationally-designed meganucleases with altered sequence specificity and DNA-binding affinity | [2011/27] | French: | Méganucléases conçues rationnellement possédant une spécificité de séquence modifiée et une affinité de liaison modifiée pour L'ADN | [2011/27] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/41] | 22.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06826293.0 / EP1945762 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060826293) is 20.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004067753 (CELLECTIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 6, line 24 - line 27 * * page 8, line 1 - line 28 * * page 12, line 1 - line 12 * * page 16, line 30 - page 17, line 5 * * page 17, line 30 - page 18, line 29 *; | [AP] - DOYON J B ET AL, "Directed evolution and substrate specificity profile of homing endonuclease I-Scel", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC; US, vol. 128, no. 7, doi:10.1021/JA0575191, ISSN 0002-7863, (20060222), pages 2477 - 2484, (20060131), XP002611223 [AP] 1-13 * abstract * * tables 1-3 * * Evolution of I-SceI Variants with Altered DNA Cleavage Specificities; page 2479 - page 2480 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JA0575191 | [A] - MOURE C M ET AL, "The Crystal Structure of the Gene Targeting Homing Endonuclease I-SceI Reveals the Origins of its Target Site Specificity", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20031205), vol. 334, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.JMB.2003.09.068, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 685 - 695, XP004473365 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figure 4 * * page 693, column l, line 6 - line 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2003.09.068 | by applicant | EP0264166 | US4873316 | US5384253 | US6316024 | US6379699 | US6387397 | US6511676 | US6593308 | US6988041 | US2006078552 | US7037492 | US7041814 | - PORTEUS ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 23, pages 967 - 73 | - TZFIRA ET AL., TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 23, pages 567 - 9 | - MCDANIEL ET AL., CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 16, pages 476 - 83 | - PORTEUS, MOL 77TER, (2006), vol. 13, pages 438 - 46 | - WRIGHT ET AL., PLANT J., (2005), vol. 44, pages 693 - 705 | - URNOV ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, pages 646 - 51 | - SMITH ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2000), vol. 28, pages 3361 - 9 | - STODDARD, Q. REV. BIOPHYS., (2006), vol. 38, pages 49 - 95 | - CHEVALIER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2001), vol. 29, no. 18, pages 3757 - 3774 | - VAN ROEY ET AL., NATURE STRUCT. BIOL., (2002), vol. 9, pages 806 - 811 | - MONNAT ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1999), vol. 255, pages 88 - 93 | - ROUET ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 14, pages 8096 - 106 | - CHILTON ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2003), vol. 133, pages 956 - 65 | - PUCHTA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 5055 - 60 | - RONG E, GENES DEV., (2002), vol. 16, pages 1568 - 81 | - GOUBLE ET AL., J. GENE MED., (2006), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 616 - 622 | - SUSSMAN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL, (2004), vol. 342, pages 31 - 41 | - EPINAT ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2003), vol. 31, pages 2952 - 62 | - SUSSMAN, J. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 342, pages 31 - 41 | - CHAMES ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2005), vol. 33, page E178 | - SELIGMAN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2002), vol. 30, pages 3870 - 9 | - ARNOULD ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2006), vol. 355, pages 443 - 58 | - CAHILL ET AL., FRONT. BIOSCI., (2006), vol. 11, pages 1958 - 1976 | - SALOMON ET AL., EMBO, (1998), vol. 1, no. 17, pages 6086 - 6095 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - GISH; STATES, NATURE GENET., (1993), vol. 3, pages 266 - 272 | - MADDEN ET AL., METH, ENZYMOL., (1996), vol. 266, pages 131 - 141 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 33 89 - 3402 | - ZHANG ET AL., J. COMPUT. BIOL., (2000), vol. 7, no. 1-2, pages 203 - 14 | - TZAKOS ET AL., ANNU. REV. BIOPHYS. BIOMOL. STRUCT., (2006), vol. 35, pages 19 - 42 | - ADAMS ET AL., ACTA CRYSTALLOGR. D. BIOL. CRYSTALLOGR., (1999), vol. 55, pages 181 - 90 | - JONES, ACTA CRYSTALLOGRAPHY, (1991), vol. A47, page 110 | - NICHOLLS ET AL., PROTEINS, STRUCTURE, FUNCTION AND GENETICS, (1991), vol. 11, no. 4, page 281FF | - BRUNGER, METH. ENZYM., (1997), vol. 276, pages 558 - 580 | - NAVAZA; SALUDJIAN, METH. ENZYM., (1997), vol. 276, pages 581 - 594 | - TONG; ROSSMANN, METH. ENZYM., (1997), vol. 276, pages 594 - 611 | - BENTLEY, METH. ENZYM., (1997), vol. 276, pages 611 - 619 | - NAVAZA, ACTA CRYST. A50, (1994), pages 157 - 163 | - ACTA CRYST., vol. D50, pages 760 - 763 | - WANG ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2006), vol. 34, no. 2, pages 517 - 527 | - WANG ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3767 - 3776 | - RUDIN ET AL., GENETICS, (1989), vol. 122, pages 519 - 534 | - FISHMAN-LOBELL ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 258, pages 480 - 4 | - CHEVALIER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (2001), vol. 29, no. 18, pages 3757 - 3774 | - SPIEGEL ET AL., STRUCTURE, (2006), vol. 14, pages 869 - 80 | - AMOULD ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2006), vol. 355, pages 443 - 58 | - SUSSMAN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 342, pages 31 - 41 | - ASHWORTH ET AL., NATURE, (2006), vol. 441, no. 7093, pages 656 - 659 | - HUDECZ ET AL., MED. RES, REV., (2005), vol. 25, pages 679 - 736 | - LASIC ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 267, pages 1275 - 76 | - RUI ET AL., LIFE SCI., (2002), vol. 71, no. 15, pages 1771 - 8 | - GRAHAM ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1973), vol. 54, no. 2, pages 536 - 539 | - ZATLOUKAL ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1992), vol. 660, pages 136 - 153 | - CAPECCHI, CELL, (1980), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 479 - 488 | - WONG ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1982), vol. 107, no. 2, pages 584 - 587 | - FROMM ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, no. 17, pages 5824 - 5828 | - JOHNSTON ET AL., METHODS CELL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 43, no. A, pages 353 - 365 | - FYNAN ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, no. 24, pages 11478 - 11482 | - CLAPP, CLIN. PERINATOL., (1993), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 155 - 168 | - LU ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1993), vol. 178, no. 6, pages 2089 - 2096 | - EGLITIS ET AL., AVD. EXP. MED. BIOL., (1988), vol. 241, pages 19 - 27 | - EGLITIS ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, no. 7, pages 608 - 614 | - CURIEL ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, no. 19, pages 8850 - 8854 | - CURIEL ET AL., HUM. GEN. THER., (1992), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 147 - 154 | - WAGNER ET AL., PROC. NAT'L A CAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, no. 13, pages 6099 - 6103 | - GREMILLON ET AL., PLANT J., (2004), vol. 37, pages 218 - 228 | - SINGH ET AL., FEBS LETT., (2003), vol. 542, pages 47 - 52 | - OMIRULLEH ET AL., PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 21, pages 415 - 428 | - GOSSLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 9065 - 9069 | - PINKERT ET AL., GENES DEV., (1987), vol. 1, pages 268 - 277 | - CALAME; EATON, ADV. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 43, pages 235 - 275 | - WINOTO; BALTIMORE, EMBO J., (1989), vol. 8, pages 729 - 733 | - BANERJI ET AL., CELL, (1983), vol. 33, pages 729 - 740 | - QUEEN; BALTIMORE, CELL, (1983), vol. 33, pages 741 - 748 | - BYRNE; RUDDLE, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 5473 - 5477 | - EDLUND ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, pages 912 - 916 | - KESSEL; GRUSS, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 374 - 379 | - CAMPES; TILGHMAN, GENES DEV., (1989), vol. 3, pages 537 - 546 | - KORMAN ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI., (1987), vol. 84, pages 2150 - 2154 | - YOUNG ET AL., J. CALIF DENT. ASSOC., (2005), vol. 33, no. 12, pages 967 - 71 | - PFEIFFER ET AL., J. VASC. SURG., (2006), vol. 43, no. 5, pages 1021 - 7 | - VAN DER GIESSEN ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 140, pages 1103 - 1108 | - CHEVALIER ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 43, pages 14015 - 14026 | - PAPWORTH ET AL., GENE, (2006), vol. 366, pages 27 - 38 | - SANGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1977), vol. 74, no. 12, pages 5463 - 7 |