EP2456040 - Circuit for storing electrical energy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flextronic Int.Kft 8900 Zalaegerszeg / HU | [2012/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tiritoglu, Okan Fichtestrasse 15 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Rupprecht, Kay Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 47-50 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10191922.3 | 19.11.2010 | [2012/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2456040 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/34 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
H02J7/007 (EP,US);
H02J7/345 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49716 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schaltung zum Speichern elektrischer Energie | [2012/21] | English: | Circuit for storing electrical energy | [2012/21] | French: | Commutateur destiné à stocker une énergie électrique | [2012/21] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 11.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 05.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/38] | 03.02.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.03.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.09.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE2725532 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,2,5 * figure 4 * [I] 6; | [XI]GB2083720 (HELVAR OY) [X] 1-3,5 * figure 1 * [I] 6; | [XI]DE20021056U (YANG TAI HER [TW]) [X] 1-5 * figure 2 * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 34 * [I] 6; | [XI]US6373152 (WANG PEI-JEN [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * figure 6 * * paragraph [0040] * [I] 6; | [A]EP1518723 (BEHR FRANCE SARL [FR]) [A] 1-6* figure - *; | [XI]US2007000775 (NAKAHARA YASUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0060] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 6-8 |