EP2330696 - Laser oscillator and filtering method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. 1-5-1, Kiba Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. 1-5-1, Kiba Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shima, Kensuke c/o FUJIKURA LTD., Sakura Works, 1440, Mutsuzaki, Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10192430.6 | 24.11.2010 | [2011/23] | Priority number, date | JP20090267337 | 25.11.2009 Original published format: JP 2009267337 | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2330696 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/067, H01S3/08 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
H01S3/0675 (EP,US);
H01S3/08027 (EP,US);
H01S3/06712 (EP,US);
H01S3/08045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Laseroszillator und Filterverfahren | [2011/23] | English: | Laser oscillator and filtering method | [2011/23] | French: | Oscillateur laser et procédé de filtrage | [2011/23] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US7177510 | JP2000249851 |