EP2333785 - Motor support structure for a reactor coolant pump set in a pressurized water reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JSPM 27 Rue de l'Industrie 59460 Jeumont / FR | [2011/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Philippart, Olivier / P22, Rue Charles Quint 59300, Valenciennes / FR | [2012/25] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
Philippart, Olivier P22, Rue Charles Quint 59300, Valenciennes / FR | Representative(s) | Lebkiri, Alexandre, et al Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25, Rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | Lebkiri, Alexandre, et al Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 87 Rue Taitbout 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10192632.7 | 25.11.2010 | [2011/24] | Priority number, date | FR20090058743 | 08.12.2009 Original published format: FR 0958743 | [2011/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2333785 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2333785 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G21C15/24, F16M7/00, F04D29/62 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
F04D29/628 (EP,US);
G21C13/024 (US);
G21C15/24 (EP,US);
G21C5/10 (US);
G21C13/00 (US);
G21C13/02 (US);
|
Former IPC [2011/24] | G21C15/24, F16M7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Title | German: | Aufbaustruktur für den Motor eines Kühlmittelpumpenaggregats in einem Druckwasserreaktor | [2011/24] | English: | Motor support structure for a reactor coolant pump set in a pressurized water reactor | [2011/24] | French: | Support de moteur d'un groupe motopompe primaire d'un réacteur nucléaire à eau pressurisée | [2011/24] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 03.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2010 | AL | 20.06.2012 | CY | 20.06.2012 | DK | 20.06.2012 | EE | 20.06.2012 | HR | 20.06.2012 | IT | 20.06.2012 | LT | 20.06.2012 | LV | 20.06.2012 | MK | 20.06.2012 | MT | 20.06.2012 | NL | 20.06.2012 | RO | 20.06.2012 | RS | 20.06.2012 | SK | 20.06.2012 | SM | 20.06.2012 | TR | 20.06.2012 | BG | 20.09.2012 | NO | 20.09.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | IS | 20.10.2012 | PT | 22.10.2012 | IE | 25.11.2012 | LU | 25.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 25.11.2010 | |
AL | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
RS | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
SM | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 25.11.2012 | ||
LU | 25.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AL | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
RS | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
SM | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 25.11.2012 | ||
LU | 25.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
RS | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 25.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
RS | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
RS | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
RS | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
RS | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
RS | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
RS | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
RS | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
RS | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | EE | 20.06.2012 | |
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
RS | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | HR | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
RS | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | LT | 20.06.2012 | |
RS | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 20.06.2012 | |
NO | 20.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60111189 ; | [A]US3788580 (THOMMES S, et al) [A] 1-6,9,13 * column 3, line 38 - column 5, line 5 * * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 50; figures 1-2 *; | [A]DE3236494 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG [DE]) [A] 1,13 * page 5, line 32 - page 7, line 26; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0223677 (NOVATOME [FR]) [A] 1-6,9,13 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 23; figures 1-6 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 30, Database accession no. 1985-181742, XP002601436 & JPS60111189 A 19850617 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1,13 * abstract * |