EP2330327 - Rotary union with selectively controlled seal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deublin Company 2050 Norman Drive West Waukegan, Illinois 60085 / US | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burrus, David 5836 North Kilbourn Avenue Chicago, IL 60646 / US | 02 /
Lacroix, Graig Aaron 997 Sanderling Court Antioch, IL 60002 / US | [2013/31] |
Former [2011/23] | 01 /
Burrus, David 5836 North Kilbourn Avenue Chicago, IL 60646 / US | ||
02 /
Lacroix, Graig Aaron 997 Sanderling Court Antioch, IL 60002 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10193039.4 | 30.11.2010 | [2011/23] | Priority number, date | US20090628642 | 01.12.2009 Original published format: US 628642 | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2330327 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2330327 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16L27/02, F16L27/08 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
F16L27/082 (EP,US);
F16D33/18 (KR);
F04B39/00 (KR);
F16D33/00 (KR);
F16D33/02 (KR);
Y10T137/0318 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | Drehverbindung mit selektiv gesteuerter Abdichtung | [2011/23] | English: | Rotary union with selectively controlled seal | [2011/23] | French: | Union rotative avec joint contrôlé de manière sélective | [2011/23] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 11.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2010 | AL | 31.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | BG | 31.07.2013 | CY | 31.07.2013 | CZ | 31.07.2013 | DK | 31.07.2013 | EE | 31.07.2013 | FI | 31.07.2013 | HR | 31.07.2013 | LT | 31.07.2013 | LV | 31.07.2013 | MC | 31.07.2013 | MK | 31.07.2013 | MT | 31.07.2013 | NL | 31.07.2013 | PL | 31.07.2013 | RO | 31.07.2013 | SE | 31.07.2013 | SI | 31.07.2013 | SK | 31.07.2013 | SM | 31.07.2013 | TR | 31.07.2013 | NO | 31.10.2013 | RS | 31.10.2013 | GR | 01.11.2013 | IE | 30.11.2013 | IS | 30.11.2013 | LU | 30.11.2013 | PT | 02.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 30.11.2010 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MK | 31.07.2013 | ||
MT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
RS | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IE | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
LU | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 30.11.2010 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
RS | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IE | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
LU | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IE | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IE | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IE | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 31.07.2013 | |
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 31.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JPH11336969 (NIPPON JOHN CRANE KK) [I] 1-19 * figures 2-3 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]WO2007071047 (TAIMI R & D INC [CA], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 26, paragraph 2 * * figures 3-4 *; | [IA]JPH08243877 (MAKINO MILLING MACHINE) [I] 16-19 * figure 1 * [A] 1-15; | [IA]JPH09100976 (MAKINO MILLING MACHINE) [I] 16-19 * figure 1 * [A] 1-15; | [A]JP2005249007 (RIX CORP) [A] 1-19 * figures 1,4 *; | [A]JP2008064274 (RIX CORP) [A] 1-19 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]JP2007218293 (RIX CORP) [A] 1-19 * figures 1-2 *; | [A]US5098135 (TIMM GERALD L [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | Examination | WO0157426 | EP1724502 | by applicant | US5538292 | US4976282 | US6325380 | US6726913 | US6149160 | US6929099 | US5669636 |