EP2343521 - Method and device for detection of goods on a conveyor line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2011/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietersberger, Martin Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 02 /
Gabler, Markus Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2014/45] |
Former [2011/28] | 01 /
Dietersberger, Martin Eichenstr. 7 83135, Schechen/Pfaffenhofen / DE | ||
02 /
Gabler, Markus Schaurain 11 83101, Rohrdorf / DE | Representative(s) | Benninger, Johannes Benninger Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr.-Leo-Ritter-Strasse 5 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2019/39] |
Former [2011/28] | Benninger, Johannes Benninger & Eichler-Stahlberg Patentanwälte Dechbettener Strasse 10 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10193353.9 | 01.12.2010 | [2011/28] | Priority number, date | DE20101000028 | 08.01.2010 Original published format: DE102010000028 | [2011/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2343521 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2343521 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2343521 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/42, G01G15/00, G06M7/00 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
G01G15/00 (EP);
G01G19/42 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/28] | G01G19/42, G01G11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] |
Former [2011/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erfassung von Gütern innerhalb einer Förderstrecke | [2011/28] | English: | Method and device for detection of goods on a conveyor line | [2011/28] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détection de marchandises à l'intérieur d'une trajectoire de transport | [2011/28] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/11] | 14.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.12.2010 | AL | 25.09.2019 | CY | 25.09.2019 | CZ | 25.09.2019 | DK | 25.09.2019 | EE | 25.09.2019 | ES | 25.09.2019 | FI | 25.09.2019 | HR | 25.09.2019 | IT | 25.09.2019 | LT | 25.09.2019 | LV | 25.09.2019 | MC | 25.09.2019 | MK | 25.09.2019 | MT | 25.09.2019 | NL | 25.09.2019 | PL | 25.09.2019 | RO | 25.09.2019 | RS | 25.09.2019 | SE | 25.09.2019 | SI | 25.09.2019 | SK | 25.09.2019 | SM | 25.09.2019 | TR | 25.09.2019 | AT | 01.12.2019 | IE | 01.12.2019 | LU | 01.12.2019 | BG | 25.12.2019 | GB | 25.12.2019 | NO | 25.12.2019 | GR | 26.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | FR | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | IS | 26.01.2020 | PT | 27.01.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/26] | HU | 01.12.2010 | |
AL | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
MT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
TR | 25.09.2019 | ||
AT | 01.12.2019 | ||
IE | 01.12.2019 | ||
LU | 01.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GB | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 01.12.2010 | |
AL | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
MT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
AT | 01.12.2019 | ||
IE | 01.12.2019 | ||
LU | 01.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GB | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 01.12.2010 | |
AL | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
AT | 01.12.2019 | ||
IE | 01.12.2019 | ||
LU | 01.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GB | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
AT | 01.12.2019 | ||
IE | 01.12.2019 | ||
LU | 01.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GB | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
IE | 01.12.2019 | ||
LU | 01.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GB | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
IE | 01.12.2019 | ||
LU | 01.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
GB | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
IE | 01.12.2019 | ||
LU | 01.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 25.09.2019 | |
NO | 25.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE19805143 (OTTMAR LINGENFELDER OLI SPEZIA [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,11 * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 18 * * column 7, line 8 - column 9, line 15 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 3,5,9,10,12; | [XI]DE4031349 (WEISS HERBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,11 * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 27 * [I] 3,9,12; | [XI]US4425974 (KIPP LOUIS D [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,11 * column 2, line 55 - column 6, line 34 * * figures 1-4d * [I] 3,9,12 | Examination | WO8204123 | by applicant | DE102006061571 | DE10257466 | DE602004004684T |