EP2319785 - Medium delivery apparatus and medium processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Toshiyuki c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suwa Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2016/13] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
Sasaki, Toshiyuki c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suwa Nagano 392-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2016/13] |
Former [2011/19] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10193410.7 | 04.02.2009 | [2011/19] | Priority number, date | JP20080026018 | 06.02.2008 Original published format: JP 2008026018 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2319785 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2319785 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65H3/06, B65H3/66, B65H1/02 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
B65H3/0653 (EP,KR,US);
B65H1/025 (EP,KR,US);
B65H3/66 (EP,KR,US);
G07D11/16 (KR);
B65H2301/3122 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2403/53 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2016/13] |
Former [2011/19] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Mediumliefervorrichtung und Mediumverarbeitungsvorrichtung | [2011/19] | English: | Medium delivery apparatus and medium processing apparatus | [2011/19] | French: | Appareil de fourniture de support et appareil de traitement de support | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 16.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09001530.6 / EP2088101 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090001530) is 11.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6067345 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]WO2004018336 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1* figure 7 *; | [AD]JP2004206362 (CANON DENSHI KK) [AD] 1-5 * abstract * | Examination | EP1958903 | by applicant | JP2004206362 | JP2008026018 | JP2008201501 |