EP2460891 - Prognostic marker for mamma carcinoma [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medizinische Hochschule Hannover Carl-Neuberg-Strasse 1 30625 Hannover / DE | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dörk-Bousset, Thilo / Bussardweg 2 30629 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Heuser, Michael / Shepton-Mallet-Ring 31 30655 Hannover / DE | 03 /
Damm, Frederik Martin Georges / Kötnerholzweg 47A 30451 Hannover / DE | 04 /
Ganser, Arnold / Karlsbader Str. 2 30559 Hannover / DE | 05 /
Park-Simon, Tjoung-Won / Krackeweg 3 30559 Hannover / DE | 06 /
Hillemanns, Peter / Wallmodenstrasse 66 30625 Hannover / DE | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Taruttis, Stefan Georg TARUTTIS Patentanwaltskanzlei Aegidientorplatz 2b 30159 Hannover / DE | [2012/23] | Application number, filing date | 10194061.7 | 07.12.2010 | [2012/23] | Priority number, date | EP20100193883 | 06.12.2010 Original published format: EP 10193883 | [2012/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2460891 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/118 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/172 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Prognosemarker für Brustkarzinome | [2012/23] | English: | Prognostic marker for mamma carcinoma | [2012/23] | French: | Marqueur de pronostic pour le carcinome mammaire | [2012/23] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 15.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - LEI WANG ET AL, "The Wilms' Tumor Suppressor WT1 Regulates Expression of Members of the Epidermal Growth Factor Receptor (EGFR) and Estrogen Receptor in Acquired Tamoxifen Resistance", ANTICANCER RESEARCH, (20100901), vol. 30, no. 9, pages 3637 - 3642, XP055007284 [Y] 1-7,12 * the whole document * | [Y] - HO PHOENIX A ET AL, "The WT1 synonymous SNP rs16754 Is Associated with Higher mRNA Expression and Predicts Significantly Improved Outcome In Favorable-Risk Pediatric AML: a Report From the Children's Oncology Group", BLOOD, & 52ND ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-SOCIETY-OF-HEMATOLOGY (ASH); ORLANDO, FL, USA; DECEMBER 04 -07, 2010, (201011), vol. 116, no. 21, page 419, XP008142991 [Y] 1-7,12 * the whole document * | [XI] - RAKHA ET AL, "Invasive lobular carcinoma of the breast: Response to hormonal therapy and outcomes", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (20071126), vol. 44, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.EJCA.2007.10.009, ISSN 0959-8049, pages 73 - 83, XP022392317 [X] 8,11 * page 75; figures 2B, 2D * [I] 9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejca.2007.10.009 | [XI] - F. DAMM ET AL, "Single Nucleotide Polymorphism in the Mutational Hotspot of WT1 Predicts a Favorable Outcome in Patients With Cytogenetically Normal Acute Myeloid Leukemia", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (20091228), vol. 28, no. 4, doi:10.1200/JCO.2009.23.0342, ISSN 0732-183X, pages 578 - 585, XP055007522 [X] 13,14 * page 579, column l, paragraph last; figure 1 * [I] 15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2009.23.0342 | [A] - SMITH D B ET AL, "Infiltrating lobular carcinoma of the breast: Response to endocrine therapy and survival", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER AND CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, OXFORD, GB, vol. 23, no. 7, doi:10.1016/0277-5379(87)90344-0, ISSN 0277-5379, (19870701), pages 979 - 982, (19870701), XP023077820 [A] 4,7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0277-5379(87)90344-0 | [A] - SARA WEDRÉN ET AL, "Catechol-O-methyltransferase gene polymorphism and post-menopausal breast cancer risk", CARCINOGENESIS, (20030401), vol. 24, no. 4, ISSN 0143-3334, pages 681 - 687, XP055007553 [A] 13-15 * page 683, column r, paragraph 2; table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/carcin/bgg022 | [A] - MIYOSHI Y ET AL, "High expression of Wilms' tumor suppressor gene predicts poor prognosis in breast cancer patients", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20020501), vol. 8, no. 5, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 1167 - 1171, XP002373767 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - LUNDIN A-C ET AL, "ASSOCIATION OF BREAST CANCER PROGRESSION WITH A VITAMIN D RECEPTOR GENE POLYMORPHISM", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (19990515), vol. 59, no. 10, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 2332 - 2334, XP000877311 [A] 1-7,12-15 * page 2333, column r, paragraph 1 * | by applicant | - MIYOSHI ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2002), pages 1167 - 1171 | - ARPINO ET AL., BREAST CANCER RES., (2004), pages R149 - 156 | - KORN, STAT MED, (1986), vol. 5, pages 255 - 260 |