EP2286731 - Surgical stapling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | ||
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, CT 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Milliman, Keith L. 5 Marywood Road Bethel, CT, 06801 / US | [2012/19] |
Former [2011/08] | 01 /
Milliman, Keith L. 5 Marywood Road Bethel, CT, 06801 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/08] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10194694.5 | 18.10.2004 | [2011/08] | Priority number, date | US20030512405P | 17.10.2003 Original published format: US 512405 P | US20030512482P | 17.10.2003 Original published format: US 512482 P | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2286731 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2286731 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2286731 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/115, A61B17/072 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61B17/072 (EP,US);
A61B17/1155 (EP,US);
A61B17/32053 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00367 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00473 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07214 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0725 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07257 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0814 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/08] | A61B17/04, A61B17/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2011/08] | Title | German: | Chirurgische Klammervorrichtung | [2011/08] | English: | Surgical stapling device | [2011/08] | French: | Dispositif d'agrafe chirurgicale | [2011/08] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 16.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04795760.0 / EP1680028 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040795760) is 27.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 19.10.2006 | IT | 18.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/37] | IT | 18.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02080781 (US SURGICAL [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 16, line 5 - page 22, line 2 * * page 31, line 13 - page 33, line 11 * * figures 1,20-23G * | by applicant | US6053390 | US5588579 | US5119983 | US5005749 | US4646745 | US4576167 | US4473077 | US5915616 | US5836503 | US5350104 | US5333773 | US5312024 | WO2001US07105 |