blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2336304

EP2336304 - Flow through purification processes for large biomolecules [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.06.2015
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.07.2015  [2015/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EMD Millipore Corporation
290 Concord Road
Billerica, MA 01821 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/16]For all designated states
EMD Millipore Corporation
290 Concord Road
Billerica MA 01821 / US
Former [2011/25]For all designated states
Millipore Corporation
290 Concord Road
Billerica, MA 01821 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Iyer, Ganspathysubramanian
290 Concord Road
Billerica, MA 01821 / US
02 / Ramaswarmy, Senthil
290 Concord Road
Billerica, MA 01821 / US
03 / Cheng, Kwok-Shun
290 Concord Road
Billerica, MA 01821 / US
 [2011/25]
Representative(s)Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al
Graham Watt & Co. LLP
St. Botolph's House
7-9 St. Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/25]Gambell, Derek, et al
Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
Application number, filing date10194894.114.12.2010
[2011/25]
Priority number, dateUS20090284368P16.12.2009         Original published format: US 284368 P
[2011/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2336304
Date:22.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2011
ClassificationIPC:C12N7/02, B01D15/08
[2011/25]
CPC:
C12N7/00 (EP,US); C12N2710/10023 (EP,US); C12N2710/10051 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16123 (EP,US); C12N2760/16151 (EP,US); C12N2760/16223 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16251 (EP,US); C12N2795/12023 (EP,US); C12N2795/12051 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Durchfluss-Reinigungsverfahren für grosse Biomoleküle[2011/25]
English:Flow through purification processes for large biomolecules[2011/25]
French:Procédés de purification d'écoulement pour biomolécules grandes[2011/25]
Examination procedure20.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/04]
20.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/31]
25.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/31]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.10.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201405   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004101765  (GIBSON MARYLOU [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9-12,14,15 * abstract * * claims 3,5 * * page 3, line 30 - line 31 * * page 6, line 1 - line 2 * * example 1 *;
 [X]WO2009020609  (NANOGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-12,14,15 * abstract * * page 2, line 26 ff. * * page 3, line 11 ff. * * page 12, line 13 - line 24 * * page 14, line 22 ff. * * page 20, line 24 ff. *;
 [XI]WO2009131526  (GE HEALTHCARE BIO SCIENCES AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-15 * abstract * * page 6, line 5 * * page 6, line 20 - line 22 * * page 8, lines 25-28 * * page 15, line 5 * * example 3 * * tables 4,5 * [I] 7;
 [X]  - LU ET AL, "Polyethylene glycol increases purification and recovery, alters retention behavior in flow-through chromatography of hemoglobin", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, (20041203), vol. 1059, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.CHROMA.2004.10.047, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 233 - 237, XP005003932 [X] 1-4,11,12,15 * abstract * * paragraph [02.2] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2004.10.047
 [X]  - MEGHROUS J ET AL, "Development of a simple and high-yielding fed-batch process for the production of influenza vaccines", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 28, no. 2, ISSN 0264-410X, (20091211), pages 309 - 316, (20091030), XP026791365 [X] 1-4,11,12,15 * abstract * * paragraph [02.8] *
 [A]  - NOAD R ET AL, "Virus-like particles as immunogens", TRENDS IN MICROBIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD., KIDLINGTON, GB, (20030901), vol. 11, no. 9, doi:10.1016/S0966-842X(03)00208-7, ISSN 0966-842X, pages 438 - 444, XP003004438 [A] 7 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0966-842X(03)00208-7
 [A]  - JUNGBAUER A, "Chromatographic media for bioseparation", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, (20050211), vol. 1065, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.CHROMA.2004.08.162, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 3 - 12, XP004750085 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2004.08.162
by applicantWO2004112707
 US2005118140
 EP1801697
 WO2008073490
 WO2008113011
    - TRANSFIGURACUIN ET AL., J VIROL METHODS, (2007), vol. 142, pages 21 - 28
    - KALBFUSS ET AL., BIOTECH. BIOENG., (2007), vol. 96, pages 932 - 944
    - WOLFGANG HAISS ET AL., DETERMINATION OF SIZE AND CONCENTRATION OF GOLD NANOPARTICLES FROM UV-VIS SPECTRA, (2007), vol. 79, pages 4215 - 4221
    - S. BRUNAUER ET AL., JAM. CHEM. SOC., (1938), vol. 60, page 309
    - OPITZ ET AL., BIOTECH. BIOENGG., (2009), vol. 103, pages 1144 - 1154
    - OPITZ ET AL., J. BIOTECH., (2007), vol. 131, pages 309 - 317
    - NAYAK ET AL., J. CHROM., (2005), vol. 823, pages 75 - 81
    - DULBECCO ET AL., COLD SPRING HARBOR SYMP. QUANT. BIOL., (1953), vol. 18, pages 273 - 279
    - "Methods in Molecular Biology", Avian Influenza Virus, E. HUMANA PRESS, (2007), page 436
    - NERMUT ET AL., AIDS RES., (1993), vol. 9, pages 929 - 938
    - GU ET AL., ENZY. MICRO. TECH., (2003), vol. 33, pages 430 - 437
    - DEPHILLIPS, J. CHROM. A., (2003), vol. 883, pages 39 - 54
    - SOBISCH ET AL., COLLOID POLY. SCI., (2006), vol. 133, pages 169 - 172
    - BRUNAUER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1938), vol. 60, pages 309 - 319
    - WULFF ET AL., THERCHIMI. ACTA, (2004), vol. 419, pages 291 - 294
    - "Ion Exchange Chromatography and Chromatofocusing- Principles and Methods", Amersham Biosciences
 US19680612843
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.