EP2337178 - Energy storage system of apartment building, integrated power management system, and method of controlling the system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Woog-Young c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/25] | Bonnans, Arnaud Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10195089.7 | 15.12.2010 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | KR20090125693 | 16.12.2009 Original published format: KR 20090125693 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2337178 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/32, H02J7/34 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
H02J7/34 (EP,US);
H02J13/00 (KR);
H02J3/00 (KR);
H02J3/32 (EP,US);
H02J3/38 (KR);
Y02B70/3225 (EP);
Y02B90/20 (EP);
Y02E70/30 (EP,US);
Y04S20/12 (EP);
Y04S20/222 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Energiespeichersystem eines Appartementgebäudes, integriertes Energieverwaltungssystem und Steuerverfahren für das System | [2011/25] | English: | Energy storage system of apartment building, integrated power management system, and method of controlling the system | [2011/25] | French: | Système de stockage d'énergie de construction d'appartement, système de gestion de puissance intégrée et procédé de contrôle du système | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 08.01.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |