EP2339500 - Analog multiplier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Macroblock, Inc. 6F.-4, No. 18, Pu-Ting Road Hsinchu City / TW | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shih, Fu-Yang 6F.-4, No.18, Pu-Ting Rd. Hsinchu City / TW | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10195124.2 | 15.12.2010 | [2011/26] | Priority number, date | TW19820023618 | 16.12.2009 Original published format: TW 098223618 | [2011/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2339500 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2339500 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06G7/16 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
G06G7/16 (EP,KR,US);
G06G7/163 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Analogmultiplizierer | [2011/26] | English: | Analog multiplier | [2011/26] | French: | Multiplicateur analogique | [2011/26] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 21.09.2012 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 04.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: information on prior art not received in time [2013/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6819093 (KAY MICHAEL R [US]) [I] 1-5 * column 2, lines 6-16; figure 2 * * column 4, lines 11-32; figure 4 * * column 5, lines 33-46; figure 6 *; | [A]GB1444765 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED) [A] 1-5 * page 1, lines 23-36; figure 2 * |