blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2466396

EP2466396 - Magnetic shield for a spiral of a timepiece [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.05.2013
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.06.2013  [2013/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Swatch Group Research and Development Ltd.
Rue des Sors 3
2074 Marin / CH
[2012/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Dionne, Jean-François
Schulhausstrasse 5A
3210, Kerzers / CH
 [2012/25]
Representative(s)Giraud, Eric, et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2012/25]Giraud, Eric, et al
ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
Application number, filing date10195192.915.12.2010
[2012/25]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2466396
Date:20.06.2012
Language:FR
[2012/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.2011
ClassificationIPC:G04B17/06, G04B17/22, G04B43/00
[2012/25]
CPC:
G04B17/063 (EP,US); G04B43/00 (US); G04B17/20 (US);
G04B17/22 (US); G04B17/222 (US); G04B17/227 (EP,US);
G04B43/002 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Magnetische Abschirmung für Spiralunruh einer Uhr[2012/25]
English:Magnetic shield for a spiral of a timepiece[2012/25]
French:Blindage magnétique pour spiral de pièce d'horlogerie[2012/25]
Examination procedure21.12.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/26]
28.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2013/26]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201203   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US965506  (ECAUBERT FREDERIC [US]) [Y] 6* figure 2 *;
 [XY]CH289106  (DUBOIS ERNEST [CH]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 1 - line 12 * [Y] 6;
 [XI]CH361247  (LIP SOCIETE ANONYME D HORLOGER [FR]) [X] 1 * page 7, line 60 - line 86; figure 3 * [I] 2,7;
 [XI]FR2000706  (JUNGHANS GMBH GEB) [X] 1 * page 2, line 38 - page 3, line 11; figure 4 * [I] 3;
 [XI]FR2063101  (LIP HORLOGERIE) [X] 1,4,5 * page 3, line 3 - line 36; figures 1, 2 * [I] 2;
 [X]CH692218  (SCHMIDT LOTHAR [CH]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 3 - line 15 *;
 [X]EP2230570  (MHVJ MANUFACTURE HORLOGERE VAL [CH]) [X] 1,4 * claims 1, 9 *
by applicantCH122391
 FR1408872
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.