Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8549832 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2013 | B2 | US2011167781 | 14.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64938709 | 30.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5933919B | Global Dossier | 15.06.2016 | B2 | JP2011137465 | 14.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US64938709 | 30.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2725891 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2018 | C | CA2725891 | 30.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64938709 | 30.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2354469 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2018 | B1 | EP2354469 | 22.01.2014 | A3 | EP2354469 | 10.08.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US64938709 | 30.12.2009 |