EP2342965 - Varying irrigation scheduling based on height of vegetation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffman, Joshua D. / 2717 Nichols Ave. Davenport, IA 52803 / US | 02 /
Anderson, Noel W. / 1241 1st Street North Fargo, ND 58102 / US | 03 /
Johnson, David A. / 210 North Church Street, 2608 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 04 /
Thacher, Russell J. / 1539 Woodcroft Dr. Fort Mill, SC 29708 / US | 05 /
Eisenbeis, Kirk N. / 9920 Kings Parade Boulevard Charlotte, NC 28273 / US | [2012/26] |
Former [2011/28] | 01 /
Hoffman, Joshua D. 2717 Nichols Ave. Davenport, IA 52803 / US | ||
02 /
Anderson, Noel W 1241 1st Street North Fargo, ND 58102 / US | |||
03 /
Johnson, David A. 210 North Church Street, 2608 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | |||
04 /
Thacher, Russell J. 1539 Woodcroft Dr. Fort Mill, SC 29708 / US | |||
05 /
Eisenbeis, Kirk N. 9920 Kings Parade Boulevard Charlotte, NC 28273 / US | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Holst, Sönke Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2011/28] | Holst, Sönke Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10195365.1 | 16.12.2010 | [2011/28] | Priority number, date | US20100683123 | 06.01.2010 Original published format: US 683123 | [2011/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2342965 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2342965 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01B79/00, A01G25/16 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
A01G25/16 (EP,US);
A01B79/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Title | German: | Variable Bewässerungsplanung je nach Vegetationshöhe | [2011/28] | English: | Varying irrigation scheduling based on height of vegetation | [2011/28] | French: | Variation de la programmation d'irrigation en fonction de la hauteur de la végétation | [2011/28] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 09.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2010 | AL | 24.10.2012 | AT | 24.10.2012 | BE | 24.10.2012 | CY | 24.10.2012 | CZ | 24.10.2012 | DK | 24.10.2012 | EE | 24.10.2012 | FI | 24.10.2012 | HR | 24.10.2012 | IT | 24.10.2012 | LT | 24.10.2012 | LV | 24.10.2012 | MK | 24.10.2012 | MT | 24.10.2012 | NL | 24.10.2012 | PL | 24.10.2012 | RO | 24.10.2012 | RS | 24.10.2012 | SE | 24.10.2012 | SI | 24.10.2012 | SK | 24.10.2012 | SM | 24.10.2012 | TR | 24.10.2012 | IE | 16.12.2012 | LU | 16.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | BG | 24.01.2013 | NO | 24.01.2013 | GR | 25.01.2013 | ES | 04.02.2013 | IS | 24.02.2013 | PT | 25.02.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/36] | HU | 16.12.2010 | |
AL | 24.10.2012 | ||
AT | 24.10.2012 | ||
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
RS | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
SM | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 16.12.2012 | ||
LU | 16.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | HU | 16.12.2010 | |
AL | 24.10.2012 | ||
AT | 24.10.2012 | ||
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
RS | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
SM | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 16.12.2012 | ||
LU | 16.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AL | 24.10.2012 | |
AT | 24.10.2012 | ||
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
RS | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
SM | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 16.12.2012 | ||
LU | 16.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 24.10.2012 | |
AT | 24.10.2012 | ||
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
RS | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 16.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AL | 24.10.2012 | |
AT | 24.10.2012 | ||
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
RS | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 16.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 24.10.2012 | |
AT | 24.10.2012 | ||
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
RS | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 16.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
RS | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 16.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
RS | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
RS | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RS | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RS | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RS | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RS | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 24.10.2012 | |
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | NO | 24.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE10349324 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [Y] 6* paragraph [0015]; figures 1,3 *; | [XYI]WO2009153304 (FACULTE UNIV SCIENCES AGRONOMIQUES GEMBLOUX [BE], et al) [X] 1,12 * page 1, line 27 - page 9, line 22; figures 1-7; claims 1,14 * [Y] 6 [I] 2-5,7-11,13,15; | [X] - SIKCHEZ A J ET AL, "Fusing 3D information for crop / weeds classification", PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2000. PROCEEDINGS. 15TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SEPTEMBER 3-7, 2000; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION. (ICPR)], LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20000903), vol. 4, doi:10.1109/ICPR.2000.902917, ISBN 978-0-7695-0750-7, pages 295 - 298, XP010533078 [X] 1,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPR.2000.902917 |