EP2339299 - Rotation angle sensor assembly and method for determining the rotation of a shaft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB Elektronik GmbH Feldmark 50 59368 Werne / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states AB Elektronik GmbH Feldmarkt 50 59368 Werne / DE | ||
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states AB Elektronik GmbH Klöcknerstrasse 4 59368 Werne / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klopfenstein, Laurent Becklohhof 42a 59368, Werne / DE | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | Kalkoff & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Kalkoff & Partner Patentanwälte Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | ||
Former [2011/26] | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | Application number, filing date | 10195440.2 | 16.12.2010 | [2011/26] | Priority number, date | DE20091055189 | 22.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009055189 | [2011/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2339299 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2339299 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/14 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
G01D5/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Drehwinkelsensoranordnung und Verfahren zur Feststellung der Drehposition einer Welle | [2011/26] | English: | Rotation angle sensor assembly and method for determining the rotation of a shaft | [2011/26] | French: | Agencement de détection d'angle rotatif et procédé de détermination de la position rotative d'un arbre | [2011/26] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/28] | 21.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE4307544 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-7,12,13 * column 1, line 48 - column 4, line 3; figures 1-4 * [A] 8 [I] 2,9-11; | [XI]DE102005021300 (VS SENSORIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,8,13 * page 3, column 17 - page 8, column 75; figures 1-5 * [I] 2,6,7,9-12; | [XAI]EP1477772 (TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,9,10,13 * page 2, column 6 - page 3, column 19; figure 1 * [A] 3,5-8 [I] 2,11,12; | [A]DE102007021320 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4400616 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |