EP2301547 - Use of activators of soluble guanylate cyclase for improving wound healing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2011/34] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma AG Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krahn, Thomas Wiener Str.29 58135, Hagen / DE | 02 /
Stasch, Johannes-Peter Alfred-Nobel-Str.109 42651, Solingen / DE | 03 /
Weimann, Gerrit Am Sonnenhut 79 51109, Köln / DE | 04 /
Thielemann, Wolfgang Ziegenburg 1 42107, Wuppertal / DE | 05 /
Stelte-Ludwig, Beatrix Görtzheide 10f 42489, Wülfrath / DE | [2011/13] | Application number, filing date | 10195559.9 | 06.07.2006 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | DE20051031575 | 06.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005031575 | [2011/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2301547 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/506, A61P17/02 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verwendung von Aktivatoren der löslichen Guanylatzyklase zur Förderung der Wundheilung | [2011/13] | English: | Use of activators of soluble guanylate cyclase for improving wound healing | [2011/13] | French: | Utilisation d'activateurs de le guanylate cyclase pour favoriser la guérison des blessures | [2011/13] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/45] | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/25] | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2012/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06762453.6 / EP1901732 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060762453) is 11.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1149583 (PFIZER PROD INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0015] , [0049]; claim 16 * * page 16, lines 13,14 *; | [A]WO2005011727 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 8, lines 2,3 * * claims 4,6,10 *; | [A]WO0030630 (LINDEN BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 4, lines 7-20 * * page 10, lines 5-18 *; | [A]WO9608966 (NEW YORK SOCIETY FOR THE RUPTU [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 3 * * page 24, lines 20-27 *; | [A]WO2005046725 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03086407 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9608966 | WO0006569 | WO0242301 | WO03095451 | WO9637192 | EP0852941 |