EP2466946 - Method and apparatus for scanning for cells in a cellular network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2012/25] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Singh, Ajay 295 Phillip Street Extension: 73174 Waterloo Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | 02 /
Naqvi, Noushad 295 Phillip Street Extension: 72683 Waterloo Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10195686.0 | 17.12.2010 | [2012/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2466946 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04W48/16 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP);
H04W88/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abtasten von Zellen in einem Zellennetzwerk | [2012/25] | English: | Method and apparatus for scanning for cells in a cellular network | [2012/25] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour balayer des cellules dans un réseau cellulaire | [2012/25] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2010 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 04.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/49] | 03.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1788719 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0014], [0020] - [0023], [0027] and [0035]; figures 3-8 *; | [A]US2008198811 (DESHPANDE MANOJ M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012], [0032] - [0047]; figures 1A-11 *; | [Y]WO2008157573 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008], [0009], [0011] - [0013], [0028] - [0031], [0040], [0053], [0068], [0069], [0077], [0082] - [0090]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP2117274 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0007] - [0011], [0014] - [0027]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP2214441 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004], [0005], [0007], [0008], [0015], [0017], [0020] - [0026], [0029], [0034], [0038], [0039], [0042], [0043]; figures 1-7 * |