EP2341400 - Developing device and image forming apparatus provided therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Document Solutions Inc. 2-28, Tamatsukuri 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 540-8585 / JP | [2018/37] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states Kyocera Document Solutions Inc. 2-28, Tamatsukuri 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 540-8585 / JP | ||
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states Kyocera Mita Corporation 2-28, 1-Chome, Tamatsukuri Chuo-ku Osaka 540-8585 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Akihiro C/O KYOCERA MITA CORPORATION 2-28, 1-Chome, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-8585 / JP | 02 /
Hamakawa, Hiroyuki C/O KYOCERA MITA CORPORATION 2-28, 1-Chome, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-8585 / JP | 03 /
Yamazaki, Hiroshi C/O KYOCERA MITA CORPORATION 2-28, 1-Chome, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-8585 / JP | [2018/37] |
Former [2011/27] | 01 /
Watanabe, Akihiro C/O KYOCERA MITA CORPORATION 2-28, 1-Chome, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
Hamakawa, Hiroyuki C/O KYOCERA MITA CORPORATION 2-28, 1-Chome, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
Yamazaki, Hiroshi C/O KYOCERA MITA CORPORATION 2-28, 1-Chome, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-8585 / JP | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstraße 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/27] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10195711.6 | 17.12.2010 | [2011/27] | Priority number, date | JP20090289220 | 21.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009289220 | JP20090289190 | 21.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009289190 | JP20100039099 | 24.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010039099 | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2341400 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2341400 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2341400 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
G03G15/0844 (EP,US);
G03G15/0893 (EP,US);
G03G15/0877 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0822 (EP,US);
G03G2215/083 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0833 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2011/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Entwicklervorrichtung und damit versehene Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | [2011/27] | English: | Developing device and image forming apparatus provided therewith | [2011/27] | French: | Dispositif de développement et appareil de formation d'images fourni avec celui-ci | [2018/16] |
Former [2011/27] | Dispositif de développement et appareil de formation d'images fourni avec celui-çi | Examination procedure | 17.12.2010 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 23.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2010 | AL | 12.09.2018 | AT | 12.09.2018 | CY | 12.09.2018 | CZ | 12.09.2018 | DK | 12.09.2018 | EE | 12.09.2018 | ES | 12.09.2018 | FI | 12.09.2018 | HR | 12.09.2018 | IT | 12.09.2018 | LT | 12.09.2018 | LV | 12.09.2018 | MC | 12.09.2018 | MK | 12.09.2018 | NL | 12.09.2018 | PL | 12.09.2018 | RO | 12.09.2018 | RS | 12.09.2018 | SE | 12.09.2018 | SI | 12.09.2018 | SK | 12.09.2018 | SM | 12.09.2018 | TR | 12.09.2018 | BG | 12.12.2018 | NO | 12.12.2018 | GR | 13.12.2018 | IE | 17.12.2018 | LU | 17.12.2018 | MT | 17.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | IS | 12.01.2019 | PT | 12.01.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 17.12.2010 | |
AL | 12.09.2018 | ||
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.12.2018 | ||
MT | 17.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.12.2018 | ||
MT | 17.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.12.2018 | ||
MT | 17.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 12.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10142927 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [XAI]JP2006323238 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-9,15,18 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0044] * [A] 10-14,17 [I] 4,6; | [A]JP2008256917 (RICOH KK) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [XAI]US2009148193 (HATAKEYAMA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,18 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0058]; figures 1-8 * [A] 10-14,17 [I] 4,16; | [XAI]JP2009210684 (KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS TECH) [X] 1-3,5-9,18 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0074] * [A] 10-14,17 [I] 4,16 |