EP2392381 - Electrical stimulation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/49] | Electrical stimulation device and method for therapeutic treatment and pain management | ||
[2016/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compex Technologies, Inc. 1811 Old Highway 8 New Brighton, MN 55112 / US | For all designated states COMPEX MEDICAL S.A. Chemin du Dévent - Z.I. Larges Pièces A 1024 Ecublens / CH | [2016/29] |
Former [2011/49] | For all designated states Compex Technologies, Inc. 1811 Old Highway 8 New Brighton, MN 55112 / US | ||
For all designated states COMPEX MEDICAL S.A. Chemin du Dévent - Z.I. Larges Pièces A 1024 Ecublens / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masko, Marshall c/o EMPI 599 Cardigan Road St. Paul, MN 55126-4099 / US | 02 /
Moore, Gary C/O COMPEX TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 1811 Old Highway 8 New Brighton, MN 55112 / US | 03 /
Lavalley, Patrick c/o EMPI 599 Cardigan Road St. Paul, MN 55126-4099 / US | 04 /
Mueller, Pierre-Yves C/O COMPEX MEDICAL, S.A. Z.i. 'larges Pieces A' Chemin Du Devent 1024 Ecublens / CH | 05 /
Lampo, Pierre-Yves C/O COMPEX MEDICAL, S.A. Z.i. 'larges Pieces A' Chemin Du Devent 1024 Ecublens / CH | 06 /
Schonenberger, Klaus C/O COMPEX MEDICAL, S.A. Z.i. 'larges Pieces A'. Chemin De Devent 1024 Ecublens / CH | 07 /
Buhlmann, Felix C/O COMPEX MEDICAL, S.A. Z.i. 'larges Pieces A'. Chemin Du Devent 1024, Ecublens / CH | 08 /
Guex, Steve C/O COMPEX MEDICAL, S.A. Z.i. 'larges Pieces A'. Chemin Du Devent 1024, Ecublens / CH | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/29] |
Former [2014/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/49] | Carroll, Christopher P., et al Ropes & Gray International LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 10195829.6 | 19.04.2006 | [2011/49] | Priority number, date | US20050672937P | 19.04.2005 Original published format: US 672937 P | [2011/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2392381 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2392381 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2392381 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/34 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
A61N1/36021 (EP,US);
A61N1/0456 (EP,US);
A61N1/0492 (US);
A61N1/322 (EP,US);
A61N1/326 (US);
A61N1/36003 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/29] |
Former [2011/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Stimulationsvorrichtung | [2016/01] | English: | Electrical stimulation device | [2016/01] | French: | Dispositif de stimulation électrique | [2016/01] |
Former [2011/49] | Elektrische Stimulationsvorrichtung und Verfahren für die therapeutische Behandlung und Schmerzmanagement | ||
Former [2011/49] | Electrical stimulation device and method for therapeutic treatment and pain management | ||
Former [2011/49] | Dispositif de stimulation electrique et procede pour le traitement therapeutique et le soulagement de la douleur | Examination procedure | 08.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 20.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2015 | 10.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06750708.7 / EP1874404 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060750708) is 19.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2006 | AT | 20.07.2016 | BE | 20.07.2016 | CY | 20.07.2016 | CZ | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | LT | 20.07.2016 | LV | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | PL | 20.07.2016 | RO | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | BG | 20.10.2016 | GR | 21.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | PT | 21.11.2016 | IE | 19.04.2017 | LU | 19.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.04.2006 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.04.2006 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 20.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19545238 (WEIS LUTZ MICHAEL DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, lines 3-4 * * column 3, line 39 - column 5, line 20 *; | [A]WO2004018038 (COMPEX MEDICAL SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1095670 (COMPEX SA [CH]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005055054 (YU TSUNG-I [TW]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5067478 (BERLANT STEPHEN R [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6002965 | US6282448 | US6408211 | US6606519 | US3472233 | US4398545 | US4982742 | US5423874 | US5578065 | US6285899 | US6631294 |