|
12.05.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.05.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.06.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2011 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.03.2011 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.03.2011 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |