Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8436113 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2013 | B2 | US2011152475 | 23.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20090127753 | 21.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101271395B | Global Dossier | 05.06.2013 | B1 | KR20110071245 | 29.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20090127753 | 21.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5691070B | Global Dossier | 01.04.2015 | B2 | JP2011127121 | 30.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20090127753 | 21.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102101899B | Global Dossier | 20.05.2015 | B | CN102101899 | 22.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20090127753 | 21.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2336203 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2020 | B1 | EP2336203 | 22.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20090127753 | 21.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2821449T | 26.04.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | KR20090127753 | 21.12.2009 |