EP2336203 - ETHYLENE ALPHA OLEFIN POLYMER FORMED BY USE OF METALLOCENE CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/25] | Ethylene alpha olefin polymer formed by use of metallocene catalyst | ||
[2020/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC SK NEXLENE COMPANY PTE. LTD. 1 Marina Boulevard 28-00 Singapore 018989 / SG | [2015/49] |
Former [2015/46] | For all designated states SK Innovation Co., Ltd. 99 Seorin-dong Jongno-gu Seoul 110-110 / KR | ||
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states SK Innovation Co., Ltd. 99 Seorin-dong Jongno-gu Seoul 110-110 / KR | ||
For all designated states SK Global Chemical Co., Ltd. 99, Seorin-dong Jongno-gu Seoul 110-110 / KR | |||
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states SK Innovation Co., Ltd. 99 Seorin-dong Jongno-gu Seoul 110-728 / KR | ||
For all designated states SK Global Chemical Co., Ltd. 99, Seorin-dong Jongno-gu Seoul 110-110 / KR | |||
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states SK Energy Co., Ltd. 90, Seorin-dong Jongno-gu Seoul 110-110 / KR | ||
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states SK Energy Co., Ltd. 99, Seorin-dong Jongro-gu Seoul 110-110 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jung, Hwan Kyu 106-805 Gyeryong Daelim e-Pyeonhansesang Apt. Dugye-ri, Duma-myeon Gyeryongi-si Chungcheongnam-do 321-764 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Young Wook 202-1101, Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu 305-761, Daejeon / KR | 03 /
Yim, Byoung Tak 310-1101, Jungang Heights Ville Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu 305-509, Daejeon / KR | 04 /
Lee, Ho Seong 1602-6, Bongcheon-7 dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-050 / KR | 05 /
Ok, Myung Ahn 209-302, Gyeongnam Anusville Apt. Yongsan-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-500 / KR | 06 /
Hahn, Jong Sok 211-1702, Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | 07 /
Shin, Dong Cheol 501-1303, Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-762 / KR | [2020/28] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
Jung, Hwan Kyu 106-805 Gyeryong Daelim e-Pyeonhansesang Apt. Dugye-ri, Duma-myeon Gyeryongi-si Chungcheongnam-do 321-764 / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Young Wook 202-1101, Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu 305-761, Daejeon / KR | |||
03 /
Yim, Byoung Tak 310-1101, Jungang Heights Ville Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu 305-509, Daejeon / KR | |||
04 /
Lee, Ho Seong 1602-6, Bongcheon-7 dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-050 / KR | |||
05 /
Ok, Myung Ahn 209-302, Gyeongnam Anusville Apt. Yongsan-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-500 / KR | |||
06 /
Hahn, Jong Sok 211-1702, Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | |||
07 /
Shin, Dong Cheol 501-1303, Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-762 / KR | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2014/38] |
Former [2011/25] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10195873.4 | 20.12.2010 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | KR20090127753 | 21.12.2009 Original published format: KR 20090127753 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2336203 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2336203 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/02 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
C08F210/02 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/06 (KR);
C08F4/64 (KR);
C08L23/00 (KR);
C08F2420/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/02, C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F2/06 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/06, C08F212/08 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] |
Former [2011/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ETHYLEN-ALPHA-OLEFIN-POLYMER, DAS DURCH DIE VERWENDUNG EINES METALLOCEN-KATALYSATORS GEBILDET WIRD | [2020/13] | English: | ETHYLENE ALPHA OLEFIN POLYMER FORMED BY USE OF METALLOCENE CATALYST | [2020/13] | French: | POLYMÈRE ALPHA OLÉFINE D'ÉTHYLÈNE FORMÉ PAR L'UTILISATION DE CATALYSEUR DE MÉTALLOCÈNE | [2020/13] |
Former [2011/25] | Ethylen-Alpha-Olefin-Polymer, das durch die Verwendung eines Metallocen-Katalysators gebildet wird | ||
Former [2011/25] | Ethylene alpha olefin polymer formed by use of metallocene catalyst | ||
Former [2011/25] | Polymère alpha oléfine d'éthylène formé par l'utilisation de catalyseur de métallocène | Examination procedure | 21.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 16.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.10.2019 | 30.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2010 | AL | 08.07.2020 | CY | 08.07.2020 | CZ | 08.07.2020 | DK | 08.07.2020 | EE | 08.07.2020 | FI | 08.07.2020 | HR | 08.07.2020 | LT | 08.07.2020 | LV | 08.07.2020 | MC | 08.07.2020 | MK | 08.07.2020 | MT | 08.07.2020 | PL | 08.07.2020 | RO | 08.07.2020 | RS | 08.07.2020 | SE | 08.07.2020 | SI | 08.07.2020 | SK | 08.07.2020 | SM | 08.07.2020 | TR | 08.07.2020 | BG | 08.10.2020 | NO | 08.10.2020 | GR | 09.10.2020 | IS | 08.11.2020 | PT | 09.11.2020 | IE | 20.12.2020 | LU | 20.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
MK | 08.07.2020 | ||
MT | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
TR | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 20.12.2020 | ||
LU | 20.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
MT | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
TR | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 20.12.2020 | ||
LU | 20.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
TR | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 20.12.2020 | ||
LU | 20.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 20.12.2020 | ||
LU | 20.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 20.12.2020 | ||
LU | 20.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 20.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 08.07.2020 | |
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 08.07.2020 | |
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN101195644 (UNIV JILIN [CN]) [Y] 1-13; | [A]WO2007123362 (SK ENERGY CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0003] *; | [A]US2007249490 (OK MYUNG-AHN [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * example 8 * | [Y] - MU, YING ET AL, "Unbridged uni/bi-core metallocene complexes and the application as catalyst for olefin polymerization", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2008:703457, URL: STN, XP002625864 [Y] 1-13 * abstract * | [Y] - KIM, TAE-JIN ET AL KIM, TAE-JIN ET AL, "Half-Metallocene Titanium(IV) Phenyl Phenoxide for High Temperature Olefin Polymerization : Ortho-Substituent Effect at Ancillary o-Phenoxy Ligand for Enhanced Catalytic Performance Half-Metallocene Titanium(IV) Phenyl Phenoxide for High Temperature Olefin Polymerization : Ortho-Substituent", MACROMOLECULES (WASHINGTON, DC, UNITED STATES) , 42(18), 6932-6943 CODEN: MAMOBX; ISSN: 0024-9297 MACROMOLECULES (WASHINGTON, DC, UNITED STATES) , 42(18), 6932-6943 CODEN: MAMOBX; ISSN: 0024-9297, (2009), XP001548724 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * * table 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma901219a | [Y] - ITAGAKI, KOJI ET AL ITAGAKI, KOJI ET AL, "Ethylene polymerization and ethylene/1-octene copolymerization using group 4 half-metallocenes containing aryloxo ligands, Cp*MCl2(OAr) [M=Ti, Zr, Hf; Ar=O-2,6-R2C6H3, R= tBu, Ph]-MAO catalyst systems Ethylene polymerization and ethylene/1-octene copolymerization using group 4 half-metal", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL , 303(1-2), 102-109 CODEN: JMCCF2; ISSN: 1381-1169 JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL , 303(1-2), 102-109 CODEN: JMCCF2; ISSN: 1381-1169, (2009), XP026068091 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * * table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcata.2009.01.001 | Examination | EP0505973 | by applicant | EP0416815 | EP0420436 | EP0842939 | US6239238 | US5198401 |