EP2337188 - Generator packaging arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation One Hamilton Road Windsor Locks, CT 06096-1010 / US | [2016/32] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation One Hamilton Road Windsor Locks, CT 06096-1010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lemmers, Jr., Glenn C. 5064 Candelabra Lane Loves Park, IL 61111 / US | 02 /
Behling, David S. 898 East Riverside Boulevard Belvidere, IL 61008 / US | 03 /
Welch, Timothy R. 11073 Branding Iron Lane Roscoe, IL 61073 / US | 04 /
Paul, Steven C. 1247 Anee Drive Rockford, IL 61108 / US | [2016/32] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
Lemmers, Jr., Glenn C. 5064 Candelabra Lane Loves Park, IL 61111 / US | ||
02 /
Behling, David S. 898 East Riverside Boulevard Belvidere, IL 61008 / US | |||
03 /
Welch, Timothy R. 11073 Branding Iron Lane Roscoe, IL 61073 / US | |||
04 /
Paul, Steven C. 1247 Anee Drive Rockford, IL 61108 / US | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2016/32] |
Former [2011/25] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10196059.9 | 20.12.2010 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | US20090284451P | 18.12.2009 Original published format: US 284451 P | US20090284452P | 18.12.2009 Original published format: US 284452 P | US20090284453P | 18.12.2009 Original published format: US 284453 P | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2337188 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2337188 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2337188 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/116, H02K7/102, H02K7/108, H02K7/18, // H02K7/20 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
H02K7/116 (EP,US);
H02K7/102 (EP,US);
H02K7/108 (EP,US);
H02K7/1823 (EP,US);
H02K2213/06 (EP,US);
H02K7/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/33] | H02K7/116, H02K7/102, H02K7/108, H02K7/18 | ||
Former IPC [2011/25] | H02K7/116, H02K7/108 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2011/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Generator-Verpackungsanordnung | [2011/25] | English: | Generator packaging arrangement | [2011/25] | French: | Agencement de conditionnement de générateur | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 01.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2010 | AL | 10.08.2016 | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | ES | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | HR | 10.08.2016 | IT | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | MK | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | RS | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | SM | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | NO | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | IE | 20.12.2016 | LU | 20.12.2016 | MT | 20.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
TR | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 20.12.2016 | ||
LU | 20.12.2016 | ||
MT | 20.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
TR | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 20.12.2016 | ||
LU | 20.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 20.12.2016 | ||
LU | 20.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 20.12.2016 | ||
LU | 20.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 20.12.2016 | ||
LU | 20.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2006260323 (MOULEBHAR DJAMAL [US]) [I] 1-3,9,11 * paragraphs [0010] , [0018] , [0019]; figures 1,4 * [Y] 4-8,10,12,13; | [IY]EP2079152 (GOODRICH CORP [US]) [I] 14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0 14]; figures 1a, 2a, 3 * [Y] 5,15; | [YA]EP2081282 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [Y] 4,6-8,10,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0004] , [00 6] , [0 19] - [0023] - [0 25] , [0 30]; figures 3-6 * [A] 1,14 |