EP2341219 - Apparatus and method for turbine blade installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2011/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howes, James Royce 534 Griffin Road Bangor, ME 04401 / US | 02 /
Anderson, Eric Donald 534 Griffin Road Bangor, ME 04401 / US | 03 /
Fournier, Gregory Norman 534 Griffin Road Bangor, ME 04401 / US | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2011/27] | Gray, Thomas, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10196511.9 | 22.12.2010 | [2011/27] | Priority number, date | US20100652029 | 04.01.2010 Original published format: US 652029 | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2341219 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2341219 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/28, F01D5/30 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
F01D25/285 (EP,US);
F01D5/3046 (EP,US);
F05D2230/60 (EP,US);
Y10T29/37 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49321 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/27] | F01D25/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Turbinenschaufelinstallation | [2011/27] | English: | Apparatus and method for turbine blade installation | [2011/27] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour l'installation d'aube de turbine | [2011/27] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/14] | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 05.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB190900581 (DAHL JOHANNES JOACHIM [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 52; figure 6 *; | [A]GB116517 (PARSONS MARINE STEAM TURBINE, et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, lines 5-19 * * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 10; figure 4 *; | [A]US4096614 (BRUNGARD ALVIN J, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 5, lines 18-67; figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]US4437213 (REESE IRA W [US], et al) [A] 1-15* column 1, lines 6-28; figures 1,4 *; | [A]DE4409686 (BOS BERLIN OBERSPREE SONDERMAS [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * figure 3 *; | [A]US6061886 (NITTA MASAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 10 * * column 5, line 10 - column 6, line 10; figures 5,9 *; | [XI]EP1955805 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,11,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0009] - [0018]; figures 2,3 * [I] 3,5-10,12,14,15; | [A]US2009047128 (BRACKEN ROBERT JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0033]; figures 5,6 *; | [A]EP2083146 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0010] - [0012] - [0014] , [0020] , [0021] , [0022]; figures 2,3 * |