EP2341102 - Thermoplastic resin composition revealing improved impact strength and melt flow property [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2, Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2011/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chung, Jin Hwa c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2, Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kwon, Kee Hae c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2, Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Koo, Ja Kwan c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2, Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Il Jin c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2, Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/49] |
Former [2011/27] | 01 /
Chung, Jin Hwa c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2, Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Kwon, Kee Hae c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2, Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Koo, Ja Kwan c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2, Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Kim, Il Jin c/o Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2, Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2015/49] |
Former [2011/27] | Bublak, Wolfgang Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10196531.7 | 22.12.2010 | [2011/27] | Priority number, date | KR20090134973 | 30.12.2009 Original published format: KR 20090134973 | KR20100096046 | 01.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100096046 | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2341102 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2341102 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08L25/12, C08L83/04, // C08L25/14, C08L55/02 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
C08L25/12 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (US);
C08G77/442 (EP,US);
C08L25/14 (EP,US);
C08L35/06 (US);
C08L55/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L25/12, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] |
Former [2011/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Thermoplastische Harzzusammensetzung mit verbesserter Stoßfestigkeit und Schmelzflusseigenschaft | [2011/27] | English: | Thermoplastic resin composition revealing improved impact strength and melt flow property | [2011/27] | French: | Composition de résine thermoplastique avec propriété améliorée de résistance à l'impact et d'indice de fluidité | [2011/27] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 04.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2010 | AL | 02.12.2015 | AT | 02.12.2015 | BE | 02.12.2015 | BG | 02.12.2015 | CY | 02.12.2015 | CZ | 02.12.2015 | DK | 02.12.2015 | EE | 02.12.2015 | ES | 02.12.2015 | FI | 02.12.2015 | HR | 02.12.2015 | IT | 02.12.2015 | LT | 02.12.2015 | LV | 02.12.2015 | MC | 02.12.2015 | MK | 02.12.2015 | MT | 02.12.2015 | PL | 02.12.2015 | RO | 02.12.2015 | RS | 02.12.2015 | SE | 02.12.2015 | SI | 02.12.2015 | SK | 02.12.2015 | SM | 02.12.2015 | TR | 02.12.2015 | IE | 22.12.2015 | LU | 22.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | NO | 02.03.2016 | GR | 03.03.2016 | IS | 02.04.2016 | PT | 04.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
BG | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
MT | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
BG | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MT | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
BG | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MT | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
RS | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61136510 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO, et al) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [X]EP0590969 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,15,17-19 * page 2, lines 3,4,5,48,49 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 15 *; | [A]EP0728809 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [A] 1-19 * Reference Examples 3,4; page 3, line 21 - line 22 * * claim 1 * | Examination | EP2407511 | by applicant | KR20100096046 | KR20090134973 |