EP2319364 - Implement having a reaction and delivery system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2017/40] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kemp, James, H. 14 Staudt Court Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | [2017/40] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
Kemp, James, H. 14 Staudt Court Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | Schicker, Silvia, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/19] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 10196914.5 | 06.05.2008 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2319364 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2319364 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A46B11/00, A46B13/04, A46B9/04, A61Q11/00, A61K8/00, A46B5/00, A61C17/22, A46D1/00 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
A46B11/0068 (EP,US);
A46B11/0003 (EP,US);
A46B11/0006 (EP,US);
A46B11/0075 (EP,US);
A46B13/04 (EP,US);
A46B9/04 (EP,US);
A61C17/349 (EP,US);
A61K8/22 (EP,US);
A61K8/347 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US);
A61C17/3436 (EP,US);
A61C17/3454 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/40] |
Former [2011/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Utensil mit einem Reaktions- und Abgabesystem | [2011/19] | English: | Implement having a reaction and delivery system | [2011/19] | French: | Outil muni d'un système de réaction et distribution | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 03.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08747713.9 / EP2285251 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080747713) is 07.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2008 | AT | 04.10.2017 | CY | 04.10.2017 | CZ | 04.10.2017 | DK | 04.10.2017 | EE | 04.10.2017 | ES | 04.10.2017 | FI | 04.10.2017 | HR | 04.10.2017 | IT | 04.10.2017 | LT | 04.10.2017 | LV | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | NL | 04.10.2017 | PL | 04.10.2017 | PT | 04.10.2017 | RO | 04.10.2017 | SE | 04.10.2017 | SI | 04.10.2017 | SK | 04.10.2017 | TR | 04.10.2017 | BG | 04.01.2018 | NO | 04.01.2018 | GR | 05.01.2018 | IS | 04.02.2018 | IE | 06.05.2018 | LU | 06.05.2018 | MT | 06.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 06.05.2008 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 06.05.2018 | ||
LU | 06.05.2018 | ||
MT | 06.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 06.05.2018 | ||
LU | 06.05.2018 | ||
MT | 06.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 06.05.2018 | ||
LU | 06.05.2018 | ||
MT | 06.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 06.05.2018 | ||
LU | 06.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
IE | 06.05.2018 | ||
LU | 06.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 04.10.2017 | |
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 04.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007025012 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraph [0041]; figure 10 * |