EP2386422 - Document and method of manufacturing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2011/46] | For all designated states The Secretary of State for the Home Department 2 Marsham Street London SW1P 4DF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gibson, Alan William United Kingdom Passport Service Globe House 89 Ecclestone Square London, SW1V 1PN / GB | 02 /
Perry, William James United Kingdom Passport Service Globe House 89 Ecclestone Square London, SW1V 1PN / GB | 03 /
Davies, John United Kingdom Passport Service Globe House 89 Ecclestone Square London, SW1V 1PN / GB | [2011/46] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Vossius & Partner POB 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/46] | Cozens, Paul Dennis, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10196939.2 | 06.01.2006 | [2011/46] | Priority number, date | GB20050019608 | 26.09.2005 Original published format: GB 0519608 | [2011/46] | Previously filed application, date | WO2006GB00027 | 06.01.2006 | [2011/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2386422 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2386422 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/10, G06K19/077 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
G06K19/07722 (EP);
B60G11/14 (US);
B42D25/24 (EP);
B42D25/305 (EP);
B42D13/00 (EP);
B42D2033/46 (EP);
B42D25/45 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/46] | Title | German: | Dokument und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2011/46] | English: | Document and method of manufacturing same | [2011/46] | French: | Document et son procédé de fabrication | [2011/46] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 31.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06700276.6 / EP1928670 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060700276) is 18.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004074000 (ENSCHEDE SDU BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,12,13,15 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 21; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2005062244 (SECURITY PRINTING AND SYSTEMS [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* claims 1-9 *; | [X]DE102004008840 (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 19] , [0 50] - paragraph [0054]; figures 4-6 * |