EP2345905 - Battery characteristic evaluator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | [2016/31] |
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamano, Satoshi c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | 02 /
Nakagomi, Masaru c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | 03 /
Kazumi, Masahiro c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | 04 /
Yoshitake, Satoshi c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | [2016/31] |
Former [2011/29] | 01 /
Hamano, Satoshi c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | ||
02 /
Nakagomi, Masaru c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | |||
03 /
Kazumi, Masahiro c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | |||
04 /
Yoshitake, Satoshi c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/31] |
Former [2011/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10197399.8 | 30.12.2010 | [2011/29] | Priority number, date | JP20100002803 | 08.01.2010 Original published format: JP 2010002803 | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2345905 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2345905 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2345905 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
G01R19/165 (KR);
G01R31/36 (KR);
G01R31/367 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2011/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Batterieeigenschaftsauswertungseinrichtung | [2011/29] | English: | Battery characteristic evaluator | [2011/29] | French: | Évaluateur de caractéristiques de batterie | [2011/29] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 08.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.12.2010 | AL | 03.08.2016 | AT | 03.08.2016 | BE | 03.08.2016 | CY | 03.08.2016 | CZ | 03.08.2016 | DK | 03.08.2016 | EE | 03.08.2016 | ES | 03.08.2016 | FI | 03.08.2016 | HR | 03.08.2016 | IT | 03.08.2016 | LT | 03.08.2016 | LV | 03.08.2016 | MC | 03.08.2016 | MK | 03.08.2016 | NL | 03.08.2016 | PL | 03.08.2016 | RO | 03.08.2016 | RS | 03.08.2016 | SE | 03.08.2016 | SI | 03.08.2016 | SK | 03.08.2016 | SM | 03.08.2016 | TR | 03.08.2016 | BG | 03.11.2016 | NO | 03.11.2016 | GR | 04.11.2016 | IS | 03.12.2016 | PT | 05.12.2016 | GB | 30.12.2016 | IE | 30.12.2016 | LU | 30.12.2016 | MT | 30.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | FR | 02.01.2017 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 30.12.2010 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
TR | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
GB | 30.12.2016 | ||
IE | 30.12.2016 | ||
LU | 30.12.2016 | ||
MT | 30.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.12.2010 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
TR | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
GB | 30.12.2016 | ||
IE | 30.12.2016 | ||
LU | 30.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.12.2010 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
GB | 30.12.2016 | ||
IE | 30.12.2016 | ||
LU | 30.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
GB | 30.12.2016 | ||
IE | 30.12.2016 | ||
LU | 30.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 30.12.2016 | ||
LU | 30.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 03.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004128088 (LALETIN WILLIAM H [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0116] , [0127] *; | [X]US6118275 (YOON CHUL OH [KR], et al) [X] 1-8 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2001035739 (LAIG-HORSTEBROCK HELMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0017] *; | [A]US2008048662 (HIRSCH KRYSTIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]US6167349 (ALVAREZ JOSE A [US]) [A] 1-8 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2002109504 (CHAMPLIN KEITH S [US]) [A] 1-8 * claims 1-3 *; | [A] - NEUMANN-SPALLART M ET AL, "Calculation of impedance spectra by Laplace transformation of voltage transients generated by current-step excitation", JOURNAL OF ELECTROANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY AND INTERFACIAL ELECTROCHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 372, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/0022-0728(93)03265-Q, ISSN 0022-0728, (19940708), pages 33 - 37, (19940708), XP026577869 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0728(93)03265-Q | by applicant | JP2003004780 | JP2005100969 |