EP2233169 - Transseptal cannula device, coaxial balloon delivery device, and methods of using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CircuLite, Inc. Park 80 West, Plaza 1 260 Pehle Avenue, Suite 403 Saddle Brook, NJ 07663 / US | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farnan, Robert C. 219 Kociemba Drive River Vale, NJ 07675 / US | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2010/39] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 10250525.2 | 19.03.2010 | [2010/39] | Priority number, date | US20090163926P | 27.03.2009 Original published format: US 163926 P | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2233169 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2233169 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M1/10, A61M27/00 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
A61M25/005 (EP,US);
A61M60/148 (EP,US);
A61M25/0082 (EP,US);
A61M25/04 (EP,US);
A61M25/1006 (EP,US);
A61M25/10182 (US);
A61M27/00 (EP,US);
A61M60/13 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0681 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1061 (EP,US);
A61M25/0069 (EP,US);
A61M25/0074 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | Transseptale Kanülenvorrichtung, Vorrichtung zur Abgabe eines koaxialen Ballons sowie Verfahren zu deren Verwendung | [2010/39] | English: | Transseptal cannula device, coaxial balloon delivery device, and methods of using the same | [2010/39] | French: | Dispositif à canule transseptale, dispositif de mise en place de ballonnet coaxial et procédés pour les utiliser | [2010/39] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2010 | AT | 06.08.2014 | BE | 06.08.2014 | CY | 06.08.2014 | CZ | 06.08.2014 | DK | 06.08.2014 | EE | 06.08.2014 | ES | 06.08.2014 | FI | 06.08.2014 | HR | 06.08.2014 | LT | 06.08.2014 | LV | 06.08.2014 | MC | 06.08.2014 | MK | 06.08.2014 | MT | 06.08.2014 | NL | 06.08.2014 | PL | 06.08.2014 | RO | 06.08.2014 | SE | 06.08.2014 | SI | 06.08.2014 | SK | 06.08.2014 | SM | 06.08.2014 | BG | 06.11.2014 | NO | 06.11.2014 | GR | 07.11.2014 | IS | 06.12.2014 | PT | 09.12.2014 | IE | 19.03.2015 | LU | 19.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.03.2010 | |
AT | 06.08.2014 | ||
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MK | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
TR | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 19.03.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.03.2010 | |
AT | 06.08.2014 | ||
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MK | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 19.03.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 19.03.2010 | |
AT | 06.08.2014 | ||
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 19.03.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 19.03.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 19.03.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 19.03.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 06.08.2014 | |
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 06.08.2014 | |
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 06.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0213748 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [X] 1,3 * figure 1b * [I] 2,4,5; | [XI]US5338301 (DIAZ JUAN-CARLOS [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 6, line 27 - line 44; figures 6, 7 * [I] 2,4,5; | [XI]EP0745409 (BARD INC C R [US]) [X] 1,3 * figure 1 * [I] 2,4,5; | [A]WO2005037345 (UNIV VANDERBILT [US], et al) [A] 6-15* the whole document * | Examination | US6328718 | by applicant | US2009112050 |