EP2242262 - Playback apparatus and method, and program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/42] | Data structure, recording medium, playback apparatus and method, and program | ||
[2013/04] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uchimura, Kouichi Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10250547.6 | 23.03.2010 | [2010/42] | Priority number, date | JP20090099415 | 15.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009099415 | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2242262 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2242262 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/76, G02B27/22, H04N13/00, G06F3/048, H04N13/04 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04N13/156 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/178 (EP,US);
H04N13/183 (EP,US);
H04N13/359 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/34] | H04N5/76, G02B27/22, H04N13/00, G06F3/048 | ||
Former IPC [2010/42] | H04N5/76 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wiedergabevorrichtung und -verfahren sowie Programm | [2013/04] | English: | Playback apparatus and method, and program | [2013/04] | French: | Appareil et procédé de lecture, et programme | [2013/04] |
Former [2010/42] | Datenstruktur, Aufzeichnungsmedium, Wiedergabevorrichtung und -verfahren sowie Programm | ||
Former [2010/42] | Data structure, recording medium, playback apparatus and method, and program | ||
Former [2010/42] | Structure de données, support d'enregistrement, appareil et procédé de lecture et programme | Examination procedure | 31.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 01.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/48] | 10.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2007037619 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 3-5,8-12 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0057] * * figures 2,3,4,5,8 * [Y] 1,2,6,7; | [YA]US6141036 (KATAYAMA TATSUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,6,7 * column 2, line 42 - line 64 * * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 40 * * column 7, line 27 - line 44 * * figures 2, 5a-5c, 10 * [A] 3-5,8-12; | [A]JPH09192349 (TAITO CORP) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0013]; figure 3 *; | [A]US6842175 (SCHMALSTIEG DIETER [AT], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 7, line 10 - column 8, line 12 * * column 10, line 24 - line 46 * * column 11, line 16 - column 12, line 16 * * figures 1, 2 * | by applicant | JP2007037619 |