EP2236089 - Multizone implants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 60 Middletown Avenue North Haven, CT 06473 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stopek, Joshua 396 Main St. Unit 6 Yalesville, CT 06492 / US | 02 /
Thomas, Jonathan D. 43 Chestnut, Unit 204 New Haven, CT 06511 / US | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2010/40] | Soames, Candida Jane Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10250632.6 | 30.03.2010 | [2010/40] | Priority number, date | US20090165064P | 31.03.2009 Original published format: US 165064 P | US20100721951 | 11.03.2010 Original published format: US 721951 | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2236089 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/04, A61B17/68, A61B17/70, A61B17/72, A61B17/80, A61B17/86, A61F2/00, A61F2/08, A61F2/44, A61L17/06, A61L27/58, A61L31/00, A61F2/06, // A61F2/30, A61F2/38, A61B17/06, A61B17/072 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61F2/0811 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00893 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00898 (EP,US);
A61B2017/044 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0448 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30062 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0031 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mehrzonen-Implantate | [2010/40] | English: | Multizone implants | [2010/40] | French: | Implants à zones multiples | [2010/40] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 12.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/10] | 30.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9315694 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 1-10,12-16 * page 3, line 6 - line 23 * * page 6, line 4 - page 11, line 6 ** figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2005283229 (DUGAN STEVE [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-16 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0077] * * figure - *; | [X]WO2008034007 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 8, line 29 - page 11, line 16 * * page 22, line 2 - page 23, line 23 * * figure - * | Examination | US4776329 | US2008091277 | by applicant | US5156616 | - Biomaterials Science, ELSEVIER ACADEMIC PRESS, (2004), pages 123 - 125 |