06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
27.10.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
28.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
14.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
16.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
09.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
18.11.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
14.11.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.11.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.11.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.11.2016 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
17.07.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.05.2014 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
01.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.07.2013 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
14.06.2013 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
03.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.11.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] |
30.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.12.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.10.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
22.07.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.07.2011 |
First examination report |
|
08.04.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
05.04.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.09.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |