01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
06.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
06.09.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
26.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
17.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
17.12.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
28.09.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] |
22.09.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.09.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.09.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.07.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.06.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
08.06.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
30.05.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.01.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
01.12.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.11.2017 |
First examination report |
|
28.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] |
28.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.08.2013 |
Publication of search report |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
02.08.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
02.08.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
26.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
24.09.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |