EP2264354 - Gas containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | [2010/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hilton, Derrick Ernest 8 FrimleyGreen Road Frimley, GU 16 8 PU Surrey / GB | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | Christie, Gemma Louise, et al The Linde Group Intellectual Property 10 Priestley Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 7XY / GB | [2014/10] |
Former [2010/51] | Wickham, Michael The Priestley Centre 10 Priestley Road Guildford Surrey GU2 7XY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10251090.6 | 16.06.2010 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | GB20090010659 | 19.06.2009 Original published format: GB 0910659 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2264354 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F17C7/00, F17C9/00, F17C13/08 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
F17C7/00 (EP);
F17C13/085 (EP);
F17C2201/0147 (EP);
F17C2201/058 (EP);
F17C2203/0604 (EP);
F17C2203/0619 (EP);
F17C2203/0639 (EP);
F17C2203/066 (EP);
F17C2205/0111 (EP);
F17C2205/013 (EP);
F17C2205/0161 (EP);
F17C2205/0165 (EP);
F17C2205/018 (EP);
F17C2205/0352 (EP);
F17C2221/014 (EP);
F17C2221/015 (EP);
F17C2221/016 (EP);
F17C2221/017 (EP);
F17C2223/0123 (EP);
F17C2223/035 (EP);
F17C2223/036 (EP);
F17C2250/032 (EP);
F17C2250/0408 (EP);
F17C2250/0636 (EP);
F17C2250/0642 (EP);
F17C2260/012 (EP);
F17C2270/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gasbehälter | [2010/51] | English: | Gas containers | [2010/51] | French: | Récipients de gaz | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 24.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/26] | 16.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.10.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.11.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN1249223 (ZHAO YIMIN [CN]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]US4460010 (PARAVIGNA ZIVKO [FR], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 21 *; | [Y]DE202008010388U (MITTENDORF JENS [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0046] *; | [Y]FR2723593 (HUANG CHING CHIANG [TW]) [Y] 1-4 * page 3, line 17 - page 6, line 18 *; | [Y]WO2007128837 (SCHUNK KOHLENSTOFFTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 5,7 * abstract *; | [Y]CN100430640C (UNIV HARBIN POLYTECHNIC [CN]) [Y] 5,6 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0894506 (OHMEDA INC [US]) [Y] 10 * abstract * |