EP2270471 - Monitoring and control of liquid additive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aquanet International Limited 8 Galloway Centre Hambridge Lane Newbury Berkshire RG14 5TL / GB | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Badger, John Raymond J.R. Badger & Co. 6 Simpson Road Wylde Green Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B72 1EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | Badger, John Raymond J.R. Badger & Co. 6 Simpson Road Wylde Green Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B72 1EP / GB | Application number, filing date | 10251201.9 | 02.07.2010 | [2011/01] | Priority number, date | GB20090011766 | 03.07.2009 Original published format: GB 0911766 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2270471 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/33, G01N21/85 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
G01N21/33 (EP);
G01N21/532 (EP);
G01N2021/8416 (EP);
G01N2201/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Überwachung und Regelung eines Flüssogadditivs | [2011/01] | English: | Monitoring and control of liquid additive | [2011/01] | French: | Surveillance et contrôle d'un additif liquide | [2011/01] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2011/23] | 22.01.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP2154267 (SENTINEL PERFORMANCE SOLUTIONS [GB]) [XP] 1-15 * abstract * * page 5 *; | [X]US2003020907 (FISHER MATTHEW L [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] *; | [X]US2006227326 (WANG SIQUN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0065] *; | [X]WO0140771 (APS TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 15 - page 20 *; | [A]US5194910 (KIRKPATRICK JR JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 12, lines 30-59 * |