EP2280232 - Bathing installation heater assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Balboa Water Group, Inc. 1382 Bell Avenue Tustin, CA 92780 / US | [2011/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perry, Loren R. 1382 Bell Avenue Tustin, CA 92780 / US | 02 /
Rosenau, Paul 1382 Bell Avenue Tustin, CA 92780 / US | 03 /
Caronna, Christopher P. 1382 Bell Avenue Tustin, CA 92780 / US | [2011/05] | Representative(s) | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose 16-18 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2011/05] | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 10251301.7 | 22.07.2010 | [2011/05] | Priority number, date | US20090509286 | 24.07.2009 Original published format: US 509286 | [2011/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2280232 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2280232 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/14, F24H1/10, F24H1/00, A61H33/00 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
H05B3/06 (EP,US);
F24H1/103 (EP,US);
F24H1/54 (EP,US);
H05B3/44 (EP,US);
H05B3/82 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0207 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/05] | F24H1/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] |
Former [2011/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Heizgerät für die Badinstallation | [2011/05] | English: | Bathing installation heater assembly | [2011/05] | French: | Dispositif de chauffage pour installation de baignoire | [2011/05] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 02.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 31.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2007108185 (ELNAR JOSEPH G [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,8,9,12,14 * paragraphs [0029] - [0038]; figures 1-6B * [Y] 15 [I] 2,5,7,10,11,13; | [XAYI]US4924069 (GIORDANI ATTILIO G [US]) [X] 1-4,12,14 * columns 4-7; figures 1-5 * [A] 6,11 [Y] 15 [I] 5; | [X]EP0915303 (ANJOU PISCINE SERVICE [FR]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]US5526538 (RAINWATER JACK D [US]) [X] 1,14 * columns 2-4; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US5892888 (ROMERO FRANCIS [FR]) [Y] 15 * column 3; figure 3 *; | [A]US4855569 (WIEDEMANN MARTIN F [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6282370 | US7030343 | US20090509343 |