Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012290242 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213560760 | 27.07.2012 | JP2009181442 | 04.08.2009 | US84933010 | 03.08.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8494796 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2013 | B2 | US2011032959 | 10.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009181442 | 04.08.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011033525 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009181442 | 04.08.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101988851B | Global Dossier | 12.12.2012 | B | CN101988851 | 23.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009181442 | 04.08.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2284497 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2014 | A3 | EP2284497 | 16.02.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2009181442 | 04.08.2009 |