EP2284826 - Organic light emitting display and method of driving the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2012/52] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-city, Gyunggi-do 446-711 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Sung-Un 508, Seongseong-dong Seobuk-gu Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | 02 /
Park, Sung-Cheon 508, Seongseong-dong Seobuk-gu Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Wook 508, Seongseong-dong Seobuk-gu Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10251386.8 | 03.08.2010 | [2011/07] | Priority number, date | KR20090071274 | 03.08.2009 Original published format: KR 20090071274 | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2284826 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,US);
G09G3/30 (KR);
G09G3/20 (KR);
G09G2310/0297 (EP,US);
G09G2330/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Organische lichtemittierende Anzeigevorrichtung und Antriebsverfahren dafür | [2011/07] | English: | Organic light emitting display and method of driving the same | [2011/07] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage électroluminescent organique et son procédé de commande | [2011/07] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 16.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 16.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/26] | 11.02.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1391871 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-10,12,13 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0107]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3-5,11; | [XY]US2002180673 (TSUDA KAZUHIHO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10,13 * paragraph [0184] - paragraph [0374]; figures 23-25,28-45 * [Y] 3-6,11,12; | [Y]US2006097974 (HASHIMOTO YOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [Y] 3-6,11,12 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1,2,5a,5b,6 *; | [Y]US2009167648 (JEON CHANG HOON [KR], et al) [Y] 3,4 * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0025] - [0028] - [0041] - [0045]; figures 2,4 *; | [Y]US2007063959 (IWABUCHI TOMOYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 5,11 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0080] - [0092]; figures 1-3 * |