EP2298737 - Indole compounds and organic light-emitting device including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 17113, 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/40] |
Former [2012/40] | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | ||
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-city, Gyunggi-do 446-711 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Young-Kook c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-do 446-711 / KR | 02 /
Hwang, Seck-Hwan c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-do 446-711 / KR | 03 /
Kwak, Yoon-Hyun c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-do 446-711 / KR | 04 /
Hye-Jin, Jung c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-do 446-711 / KR | 05 /
Jong-Hyuk, Lee c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-do 446-711 / KR | 06 /
Jin-O, Lim c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-do 446-711 / KR | [2017/19] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
Kim, Young-Kook c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-do 446-711 / KR | ||
02 /
Hwang, Seck-Hwan c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-do 446-711 / KR | |||
03 /
Kwak, Yoon-Hyun c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-do 446-711 / KR | |||
04 /
Hye-Jin, Jung c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-do 446-711 / KR | |||
05 /
Jong-Hyuk, Lee c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-do 446-711 / KR | |||
06 /
Jin-O, Lim c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-do 446-711 / KR | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Mounteney, Simon James, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2011/12] | Taor, Simon Edward William Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10251513.7 | 27.08.2010 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | KR20090080701 | 28.08.2009 Original published format: KR 20090080701 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2298737 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2298737 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/08, C07D209/86, C07D209/88, C07D405/04, C07D405/14, C07D409/04, C07D409/14, C09K11/06, H01L51/50 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
C07D209/08 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (KR);
C07D209/04 (KR);
C07D209/86 (EP,US);
C07D209/88 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] |
Former [2011/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Indolverbindungen und sie enthaltende organische lichtemittierende Vorrichtung | [2011/12] | English: | Indole compounds and organic light-emitting device including the same | [2011/12] | French: | Composés indole et dispositif électroluminescent organique les incluant | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 05.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.08.2010 | AL | 10.05.2017 | AT | 10.05.2017 | CY | 10.05.2017 | CZ | 10.05.2017 | DK | 10.05.2017 | EE | 10.05.2017 | ES | 10.05.2017 | FI | 10.05.2017 | HR | 10.05.2017 | IT | 10.05.2017 | LT | 10.05.2017 | LV | 10.05.2017 | MC | 10.05.2017 | MK | 10.05.2017 | NL | 10.05.2017 | PL | 10.05.2017 | PT | 10.05.2017 | RO | 10.05.2017 | SE | 10.05.2017 | SI | 10.05.2017 | SK | 10.05.2017 | SM | 10.05.2017 | TR | 10.05.2017 | BG | 10.08.2017 | NO | 10.08.2017 | GR | 11.08.2017 | IE | 27.08.2017 | LU | 27.08.2017 | MT | 27.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | IS | 10.09.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 27.08.2010 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
MT | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 27.08.2010 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
MT | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 27.08.2010 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
MT | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 27.08.2010 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
MT | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.08.2010 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
MT | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
MT | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IE | 27.08.2017 | ||
LU | 27.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007072002 (KIM MYEONG-SUK [KR], et al) [X] 1-7,9-18 * the whole document; in particular, pages 13-15, the compounds of formulae 65, 69, 74 and 80 *; | [A]EP2085382 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [XP]US2010033088 (HWANG SEOK-HWAN [KR], et al) [XP] 1,2,4,6,9-18* the whole document * |