12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
04.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
15.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
04.07.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
28.03.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
14.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
10.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
25.10.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
26.07.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
24.07.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.07.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.07.2013 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
22.03.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.11.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] |
28.10.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
27.10.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.10.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
06.05.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] |