Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9931743 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2018 | B2 | US2015306756 | 29.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414188869 | 25.02.2014 | US201514792829 | 07.07.2015 | US97104910 | 17.12.2010 | US28794009 | 18.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9085077 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2015 | B2 | US2014166327 | 19.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414188869 | 25.02.2014 | US97104910 | 17.12.2010 | US28794009 | 18.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8695725 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2014 | B2 | US2011272172 | 10.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97104910 | 17.12.2010 | US28794009 | 18.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10525578 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2020 | B2 | US2018215028 | 02.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414188869 | 25.02.2014 | US201514792829 | 07.07.2015 | US97104910 | 17.12.2010 | US28794009 | 18.12.2009 | US201815937196 | 27.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2674259 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2017 | B1 | EP2674259 | 16.12.2015 | A3 | EP2674259 | 18.12.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP10252114 | 14.12.2010 | US28794009 | 18.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2388107 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2019 | B1 | EP2388107 | 27.02.2013 | A3 | EP2388107 | 23.11.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP10252114 | 14.12.2010 | US28794009 | 18.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104526655B | Global Dossier | 28.07.2017 | B | CN104526655 | 22.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201010610158 | 17.12.2010 | US28794009 | 18.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103862440B | Global Dossier | 30.03.2016 | B | CN103862440 | 18.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201010610158 | 17.12.2010 | US28794009 | 18.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102303307B | Global Dossier | 23.07.2014 | B | CN102303307 | 04.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US28794009 | 18.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102126200B | Global Dossier | 03.02.2016 | B | CN102126200 | 20.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US28794009 | 18.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2338644 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2019 | B1 | EP2338644 | 27.02.2013 | A3 | EP2338644 | 29.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US28794009 | 18.12.2009 | Type | Divisional application | EP2388107 | EP2674259 |