EP2357611 - Model-based play field registration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tong, Xiaofeng Room 1103, Building 1 Shuangyushu Xili Haidian District Beijing 100086 / CN | 02 /
Li, Wenlong Room 18-4-502, Tiantongyuan West 2 District Changping District Beijing 100043 / CN | 03 /
Zhang, Yimin of Tai Yang Yuan Room 11-1507, Da ZhongSi, Haidian District Beijing 100086 / CN | [2011/33] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 10252179.6 | 21.12.2010 | [2011/33] | Priority number, date | US20090646807 | 23.12.2009 Original published format: US 646807 | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2357611 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2357611 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T3/00 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
G06T3/14 (EP,US);
G06T7/35 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Modellbasierte Spielfeldregistrierung | [2011/33] | English: | Model-based play field registration | [2011/33] | French: | Enregistrement de champ de jeu à base de modèle | [2011/33] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 17.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.10.2015 | 14.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/49] | 24.07.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 27.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - LIU HARBIN INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY (CHINA) Y ET AL, "A new method to calculate the camera focusing area and player position on playfield in soccer video", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING; 12-7-2005 - 15-7-2005; BEIJING,, (20050712), XP030080996 [X] 1-4,6-10,12,13 * abstract * * section 1. Introduction; 2. Theoretical Computation and the overview of the system * [Y] 5,11 | [X] - JEAN-BERNARD HAYET ET AL, "Robust incremental rectification of sport video sequences", BRITISH MACHINE VISION CONFERENCE 7-9TH SEPT 2004, KINGSTON UNIVERSITY, LONDON,, (20040907), page 10PP, XP009155798 [X] 1,2,6-8,12,13 * abstract * * section 1 Introduction; 2 Homography and rectification * | [A] - FARIN D ET AL, "Robust camera calibration for sport videos using court models", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, SPIE, US, (20040101), vol. 5307, doi:10.1117/12.526813, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 80 - 91, XP002364795 [A] 1-4,6-10,12,13 * abstract * * section 2. Algorithm Overview * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.526813 | [Y] - WENLONG LI ET AL, "Optimization and Parallelization on a Multimeida Application", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2007 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20070701), ISBN 978-1-4244-1016-3, pages 1854 - 1857, XP031124010 [Y] 5,11 * section 2. Overview of Goalmouth Detection;; figure 4 * | [A] - FARIN D ET AL, "Fast Camera Calibration for the Analysis of Sport Sequences", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2005. ICME 2005. AMSTERDAM, THE NETHERLANDS, 06-08 JULY 2005, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20050706), doi:10.1109/ICME.2005.1521465, ISBN 978-0-7803-9331-8, pages 482 - 485, XP010844355 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * section 2. Overview of the Calibration System * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICME.2005.1521465 | Examination | - HOLZER S ET AL, "Distance transform templates for object detection and pose estimation", 2009 IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION : CVPR 2009 ; MIAMI [BEACH], FLORIDA, USA, 20 - 25 JUNE 2009, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20090620), ISBN 978-1-4244-3992-8, pages 1177 - 1184, XP031607304 |