EP2469757 - Communications network management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Telecommunications Public Limited Company 91 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin, et al BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A, BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10252223.2 | 24.12.2010 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2469757 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
H04L41/0816 (EP,US);
H04L41/147 (EP,US);
H04L41/5025 (EP,US);
H04L41/5077 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kommunikationsnetzwerkverwaltung | [2012/26] | English: | Communications network management | [2012/26] | French: | Gestion de réseau de communication | [2012/26] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2012/50] | 27.07.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0245315 (MICROMUSE INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * claims 1,4-10 * * page 20, line 18 - line 25 ** claims 48,53,61 *; | [A]EP1351441 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * claims 1,2 * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0034] *; | [A]WO2007048738 (IBM [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 9, line 2 - line 6 * * page 9, line 20 - line 23 * * claims 1,8 * * figure 10 * * page 15, column 30 - page 16, column 6 *; | [I]WO2010112855 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * claims 1-4 * * page 3, line 12 - line 24 * * page 3, line 31 - line 33 * * page 4, line 8 - line 27 * * page 4, line 33 - line 34 * * figure 8 * * page 14, line 20 - line 27 * | by applicant | EP20100250540 |