EP2385721 - Providing enhanced quality of service differentiation in a mobile communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2011/45] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 32 avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brigant, Eric c/o Alcatel-Lucent France 7-9, Avenue Morane Saulnier 78141 Velizy / FR | 02 /
Bussschbach, Peter c/o Alcatel-Lucent USA PO Box 636 Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | 03 /
Umarale, Sudhir c/o Alcatel-Lucent USA PO Box 636 Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | 04 /
Thiebaut, Laurent c/o Alcatel Lucent France Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | 05 /
Allan, Keith c/o Alcatel Lucent Canbada Inc. 10T3 Office 11 600 March Rd. Ottawa, ON K2 / CA | [2011/45] | Representative(s) | El Manouni, Josiane, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Patent Business Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | El Manouni, Josiane, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2011/45] | El Manouni, Josiane, et al 32 Avenue Kléber 92707 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10290237.6 | 03.05.2010 | [2011/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2385721 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/16, H04L12/56 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
H04L47/808 (EP);
H04W28/0205 (EP);
H04W28/0268 (EP);
H04L47/31 (EP);
H04W28/0263 (EP);
H04W28/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur verbesserten Differenzierung der Dienstgüte für die drahtlose Kommunikation | [2011/45] | English: | Providing enhanced quality of service differentiation in a mobile communication system | [2011/45] | French: | Procédé pour fournir une différentiation améliorée de la qualité de service pour des communications sans fil | [2011/45] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 04.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/30] | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6473793 (DILLON DOUGLAS M [US], et al) [X] 1,25 * column 2, lines 11-17,39-41,54-57, * * column 6, lines 66-67 * * column 9, lines 1-12,43-59 * * column 14, line 43 - column 15, line 20 ** column 16, lines 38-56 *; | [X]US2005052992 (CLOONAN THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7-9,25 * paragraphs [0009] - [0016] - [0045] , [0 48] , [0052] - [0055] - [0066] , [0088] , [0090] , [0092] , [0101] , [0102] *; | [XI]EP2154837 (VODAFONE PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,25 * paragraphs [0006] - [0019] - [0045] - [0059] * [I] 2-24 |