EP2400418 - Control performance and security levels of a software through transformation of program code [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trusted Logic 6 rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phan, Guillaume c/o Trusted Logic 5 Rue du Bailliage 78000 Versailles / FR | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/52] | Application number, filing date | 10290341.6 | 23.06.2010 | [2011/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2400418 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00, G06F21/02, G06F21/22, G06F9/45 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
G06F21/125 (EP);
G06F21/14 (EP);
G06F21/51 (EP);
G06F21/54 (EP);
G06F21/77 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verwaltung von Leistung- und Sicherheitsniveau eines Softwares mittels Übersetzung des Programmcodes | [2011/52] | English: | Control performance and security levels of a software through transformation of program code | [2011/52] | French: | Contrôle des propriétés de performance et de sécurité d'un logiciel par transformation de code | [2011/52] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 29.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 07.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2008040607 (KAABOUCH MAJID [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] , [0021] , [0030] , [0035] , [0045] , [0048] , [0051] * * figure 2 * [Y] 4-9,11-15; | [IA]EP2196934 (GEMALTO SA [FR]) [I] 1-3,10 * paragraphs [0033] , [0035] , [0037] , [0042] , [0043] , [0044] , [0049] , [0051] , [0057] , [0058] , [0070] * [A] 4-9,11-15; | [Y]US2004148514 (FEE GREGORY D [US], et al) [Y] 4-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0025] , [0040] , [0052] , [0053] , [0064] , [0100] *; | [IA]US2010058477 (CIET MATHIEU [FR], et al) [I] 1-3,10 * paragraphs [0009] , [0027] , [0035] , [0039] , [0041] * [A] 4-9,11-15; | [IA]US2006136867 (SCHNEIDER MANFRED [DE], et al) [I] 1-3,10 * paragraphs [0005] , [0012] , [0026] , [0031] * [A] 4-9,11-15; | [A]US2003056054 (LEVY MOSHE [US], et al) [A] 4-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0009] , [0027] , [0029] * * figure 3 *; | [A]WO0199030 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 4-9,11-15 * page 2, line 25 - page 2, line 28 * * page 5, line 6 - page 5, line 9 * * page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 7 * | by applicant | US6904516 | US6978448 | - AVA CARD 2.2 OFF-CARD VERIFIER, (200206), URL: http://java .sun.com/javacard | FR19990010697 |