EP2293090 - Improved method for estimating non-measurable characteristics of an electro-chemical system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2017/44] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states IFP Energies Nouvelles 1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prada, Eric 211 avenue Jean Jaurès 69007 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Sauvant-Moynot, Valérie 1 place Jules Ferry 69006 Lyon / FR | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | IFP Energies nouvelles Département Propriété Industrielle Rond Point de l'échangeur de Solaize BP3 69360 Solaize / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 10290400.0 | 16.07.2010 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | FR20090004159 | 02.09.2009 Original published format: FR 0904159 | [2011/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2293090 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2293090 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
G01R31/367 (EP,US);
G01R31/3842 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2011/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbessertes Verfahren zur Schätzung nicht messbarer Charakteristiken eines elektrochemischen Systems | [2011/10] | English: | Improved method for estimating non-measurable characteristics of an electro-chemical system | [2011/10] | French: | Méthode améliorée pour estimer les caractéristiques non mesurables d'un système électrochimique | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2010 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 01.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 25.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6016047 (NOTTEN PETRUS H L [NL], et al) [X] 1,5-13,15-19 * column 12, line 30 - column 27, line 62 * * column 4, line 28 - line 54 * * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 41 * * figure 1 * * column 7, line 59 - line 63 * [I] 2-4,14; | [XI]US2002120906 (XIA LEI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-12,14,15,17,19 * paragraph [0372] - paragraph [0374] * * paragraph [0408] - paragraph [0410] * * figures 37-38 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0364] * * claims 1,3 * * paragraph [0309] * * paragraph [0297] * * paragraph [0219] * * paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0145] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0122] * [I] 3,4,13,16,18; | [XI]EP0987555 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,8-12,15 * paragraph [0130] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0053] * * figure 3 * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0078] * * claim 11 * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * [I] 3-7,13,14,16-19; | [XI]WO2008117732 (TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8-15 * page 52, line 8 - page 58, line 7 * * page 1, line 6 - line 8 * * page 17, line 18 - page 25, line 11 * * page 35, line 12 - line 19 * * page 28, line 2 - line 14 * * page 8, line 3 - page 10, line 3 * * figure 1 * [I] 3-5,7,16-19; | [XPI]WO2009130405 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR], et al) [XP] 1,5,8,9,11-18 * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 9 * * figures 1,2,4,6 * * page 10, line 3 - page 26, line 3 * * page 7, line 21 - line 29 * [I] 2-4,6,7,10; | [A]EP1562049 (VB AUTOBATTERIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [XI] - Jochen Gernhard Gerschler et al., "High-spatial impedance-based modeling of electrical and thermal behavior of lithium-ion batteries - A powerful desging and analysis tool for battery packs in hybrid electric vehicles", ANAHEIM, USA, (20071205), pages 1/17 - Slides 1/3, Electric Vehicle Symposium (EVS 23), URL: http://www.isea.rwth-aachen.de/publications/pdf/274492804bd6d779a5651eed557ce25c6fb09741, (20100420), XP002578596 [X] 1,8-12,14,17 * figure 13 * * page 2 * * page 7 - page 9 * * page 3 * * figure 1 * * figure 11 * * slides 7-10 * * page 15 * * slides 16-26 * [I] 2-7,13,15,16,18,19 | [A] - Hartmann, "An Aging Model for Lithium-Ion Cells", (20081217), URL: https://etd.ohiolink.edu/!etd.send_file?accession=akron1226887071&disposition=inline, (20171005), XP055413352 [A] 2-4 * page 52 - page 54 * * Section 2.4.5 * * Tableau 2.2, page 48 * | [A] - NING G ET AL, "A generalized cycle life model of rechargeable Li-ion batteries", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, vol. 51, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.ELECTACTA.2005.06.033, ISSN 0013-4686, (20060201), pages 2012 - 2022, (20060201), XP028027220 [A] 2-4 * page 2013, column droite, line 45 - page 2014, column gauche, line 16 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.electacta.2005.06.033 | [A] - PENG RONG ET AL, "An analytical model for predicting the remaining battery capacity of lithium-ion batteries", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VERY LARGE SCALE INTEGRATION (VLSI) SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20060501), vol. 14, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TVLSI.2006.876094, ISSN 1063-8210, pages 441 - 451, XP011326332 [A] 2-4 * section III: Battery Background / Section D: Cycle Aging * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TVLSI.2006.876094 | [A] - PANKAJ ARORA ET AL, "Capacity Fade Mechanisms and Side Reactions in Lithium-Ion Batteries", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19981001), vol. 145, no. 10, doi:10.1149/1.1838857, pages 3647 - 3847, XP055153679 [A] 3,4 * page 3663, column gauche, line 7 - line 14 * * Équation 81 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1838857 | [A] - SAUER D U, "Modelling of local conditions in flooded lead/acid batteries in photovoltaic systems", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SA, CH LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0378-7753(96)02519-0, (19960101), vol. 64, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 181 - 187, XP004075209 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-7753(96)02519-0 | by applicant | US6191590 | EP1835297 | US2007090843 | US6778913 | US6037777 | US2007035307 | EP0880710 | FR801709 |