12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
14.11.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
22.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
06.12.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
03.12.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.11.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.11.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.07.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.01.2012 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
24.01.2012 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
24.01.2012 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
20.01.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.12.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.11.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
15.04.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] |