EP2458024 - Method for the recovery of uranium from pregnant liquor solutions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Europe Services ApS Succursale France 185 Rue de Bercy 75579 Paris Cedex 12 / FR | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rezkallah, Areski 3 Rue André Ternynck 02300 Chauny / FR | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10290625.2 | 24.11.2010 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2458024 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C22B3/00, C22B60/02 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
C22B60/0234 (EP,US);
C22B3/3844 (EP,US);
C22B60/0265 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von Uran aus Mutterlaugenlösungen | [2012/22] | English: | Method for the recovery of uranium from pregnant liquor solutions | [2012/22] | French: | Procédé pour la récupération d'uranium de solutions de liqueur sursaturée | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 08.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58181730 (UNITIKA LTD) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [IA]EP0532919 (SIEMENS NUCLEAR POWER CORP [US]) [I] 1,3-7 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 36; example 1 * * column 5, line 17 - line 28 * [A] 2; | [I] - V. N. RYCHKOV, "Uranium Sorption from Sulfate Solutions with Polyampholytes", RADIOCHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 45, no. 1, pages 54 - 58, XP002632138 [I] 1-7 * EXPERIMENTAL;;; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1022321502685 | by applicant | US4599221 |