EP2210479 - Device for cultivating plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avance Technologique Choletaise Z.I. de l'Appentière 49280 Mazieres en Mauges / FR | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dufort, Christophe 26 rue de la Passerelle 49300 Cholet / FR | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Laget, Jean-Loup Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | Laget, Jean-Loup Brema-Loyer Le Centralis 63 avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 10305014.2 | 06.01.2010 | [2010/30] | Priority number, date | FR20090000247 | 21.01.2009 Original published format: FR 0900247 | [2010/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2210479 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/02 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
A01G9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Pflanzvorrichtung | [2010/30] | English: | Device for cultivating plants | [2010/30] | French: | Dispositif de culture de végétaux | [2010/30] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 23.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/53] | 27.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2530408 (BOURGEAIS GERARD [FR]) [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 2-8; | [XA]FR2797379 (GALLON OLIVIER [FR]) [X] 1,9,10 * page 1, lines 1-39 * * page 3, lines 1-24; figures 1,2,8 * [A] 2-8; | [A]FR2852782 (GALVA JARDIN [FR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US592066 (MCDUFF SIMPSON) [A] 5-8 * the whole document * |